This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/24/2023 at 08:33:46 (UTC).

Winterspring Digital LLC v. Marvell International, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 Winterspring Digital LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Marvell International, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy S. Payne and Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Winterspring Digital LLC

Defendants

Marvell International, Ltd.

Marvell Technology Group, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vincent J Rubino, III

Defendant Attorneys

Harper S Batts

Christopher Scott Ponder

Jeffrey Liang

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Winterspring Digital LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Winterspring Digital LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Summons(es) Marvell Technology Group Ltd

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harper S Batts on behalf of All Defendants (Batts, Harper) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#7

(#7) DEFICIENT DOCUMENT Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. (Batts, Harper) Modified on 3/21/2023 (nkl,). (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Scott Ponder on behalf of Marvell International, Ltd., Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. (Ponder, Christopher) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Liang on behalf of Marvell International, Ltd., Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. (Liang, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Winterspring Digital LLC. Marvell International, Ltd. waiver sent on 3/20/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#11

(#11) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Marvell Technology Group, Ltd..( Batts, Harper) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/22/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. to 5/4/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Marvell Technology Group, Ltd..( Batts, Harper) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

Docket***FILED IN ERROR - exceeds the number of days the Clerk is allowed to grant. Document # 7, Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Winterspring Digital LLC. Marvell International, Ltd. waiver sent on 3/20/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Liang on behalf of Marvell International, Ltd., Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. (Liang, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Scott Ponder on behalf of Marvell International, Ltd., Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. (Ponder, Christopher) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) DEFICIENT DOCUMENT Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Marvell Technology Group, Ltd. (Batts, Harper) Modified on 3/21/2023 (nkl,). (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harper S Batts on behalf of All Defendants (Batts, Harper) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Marvell International, Ltd., Marvell Technology Group, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Marvell Technology Group Ltd)(nkl, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023

DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Winterspring Digital LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Winterspring Digital LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9320671.), filed by Winterspring Digital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less