This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2020 at 08:42:52 (UTC).

Winters, III v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston n/k/a Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Winters, III filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston n/k/a Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark L. Wolf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11937

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark L. Wolf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward J Winters, III

Defendant

Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean T. Carnathan

Attorney at O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

1 Van De Graaff Drive, Suite 104

Burlington, MA 01803

Joseph P. Calandrelli

Attorney at O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

1 Van De Graaff Drive, Suite 104

Burlington, MA 01803

Ryan D. Saba

Attorney at Rosen Saba, LLP

9350 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 250

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Laura Kelly St. Martin

Attorney at Rosen Saba, LLP

350 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 250

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorney

Byrne J. Decker

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

2 Monument Square, 7Th Floor

Portland, ME 04101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A-C

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

#10

10 #1

Declaration

#11

11 #1

Declaration

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ryan D. Saba. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Laura Kelly St. Martin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ryan D. Saba Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8565287 by Edward J Winters, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Laura Kelly St. Martin Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8565261 by Edward J Winters, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Decker, Byrne) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 12/18/2020. (Loret, Magdalena) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.. (Decker, Byrne) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 18, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Decker, Byrne) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Calandrelli on behalf of Edward J Winters, III (Calandrelli, Joseph) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston n/k/a Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8484805 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Edward J Winters, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean T. Carnathan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan D Saba

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Calandrelli