This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:09:38 (UTC).

Winn et al v. United States Postal Service

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Winn filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United States Postal Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00842

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Willie J. Winn

Albert A. Douglas

Defendant

United States Postal Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy Simien

Attorney at Simien & Simien

7908 Wrenwood Boulevard

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Eulis Simien, Jr.

Attorney at Simien & Simien

7908 Wrenwood Boulevard

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Summons Submitted (Simien, Eulis) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Summons Submitted (Simien, Eulis) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/10/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2041624.), filed by Willie J. Winn, Albert A. Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons - USPS)(Simien, Eulis) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

8 #1

summons

#6

(#6) Summons Submitted (Simien, Eulis) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #2

Attachment Summons - USPS

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service, United States Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(EDC) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Motion for Leave to Continue Scheduling Conference by Albert A. Douglas, Willie J. Winn. (Simien, Eulis) Modified on 1/8/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

8 #2

summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Continue Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 is RESET for 4/9/2020 at 9:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. A Status Report shall be filed on or before 3/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/9/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service, United States Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(EDC) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Submitted (Simien, Eulis) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Submitted (Simien, Eulis) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Submitted (Simien, Eulis) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion for Leave to Continue Scheduling Conference by Albert A. Douglas, Willie J. Winn. (Simien, Eulis) Modified on 1/8/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/10/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2041624.), filed by Willie J. Winn, Albert A. Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons - USPS)(Simien, Eulis) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.