This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2021 at 08:41:49 (UTC).

WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC. et al v. ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against ACTAVIS HOLDCO U S , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06290

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.

Defendants

BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC.

HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

PLIVA, INC.

MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC.

EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC

KEVIN GREEN

MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

Konstantin Ostaficiuk

UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC

JAMES BROWN

Marc Falkin

HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC

TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

Maureen Cavanaugh

DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC.

SANDOZ, INC.

ALVOGEN, INC.

52 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PATRICK J. AHERN

Attorney at AHERN & ASSOCIATES PC

8 South Michigan Ave Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60603

THEODORE B. BELL

Attorney at AHERN & ASSOCIATES PC

8 South Michigan Ave Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

LAUREN NORRIS DONAHUE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

BRIAN J SMITH

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

MICHAEL E. MARTINEZ

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

LAURI A. KAVULICH

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market Street, Suite 2620

Philadelphia, PA 19103

LINDSAY S. FOUSE

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

One Oxford Centre, 301 Grant Street, 14Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

LAURA S. SHORES

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

MARGARET A. ROGERS

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLAR LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

SAUL P MORGENSTERN

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

NATHAN M. BUCHTER

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2000 Market St 20Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DAVID M. MAX

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

DOUGLAS M. TWEEN

Attorney at LINKLATERS LLP

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

SETH B. DAVIS

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

SETH A. MOSKOWITZ

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

HECTOR TORRES

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

GERALD E. ARTH

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2000 Market St., 20Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SHERON KORPUS

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

HEATHER K. MCDEVITT

Attorney at WHITE & CASE LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Strides Pharma Science Limited with Certificate of Service by STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,.(TWEEN, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS M. TWEEN on behalf of STRIDES PHARMA, INC., with Certificate of Service(TWEEN, DOUGLAS) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. MAX on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAX, DAVID) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by SETH A. MOSKOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(MOSKOWITZ, SETH) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by SETH B. DAVIS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(DAVIS, SETH) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR TORRES on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(TORRES, HECTOR) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by MARC E. KASOWITZ on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KASOWITZ, MARC) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by SHERON KORPUS on behalf of ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORPUS, SHERON) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD E. ARTH on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(ARTH, GERALD) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by NATHAN M. BUCHTER on behalf of LANNETT COMPANY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BUCHTER, NATHAN) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN L. ROSENBERG on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, KATHRYN) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ADA VICTORIA ANON on behalf of FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC. with Certificate of Service(ANON, ADA) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE B. BELL on behalf of BI-LO HOLDING, LLC, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC. (BELL, THEODORE) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. AHERN on behalf of BI-LO HOLDING, LLC, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC. (AHERN, PATRICK) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by LINDSAY S. FOUSE on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE(FOUSE, LINDSAY) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by LAURI A. KAVULICH on behalf of SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(KAVULICH, LAURI) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT THE JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS APPROVED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/19/2021. 1/19/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (APPLIES TO CIVIL ACTION 20-6290)(kp, ) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., ALVOGEN, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, APOTEX CORP., ARA APRAHAMIAN, AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., JAMES BROWN, David Berthold, CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, Maureen Cavanaugh, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., Tracy Sullivan Divalerio, EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, EPIC PHARMA LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Marc Falkin, G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, KEVIN GREEN, GREENSTONE, LLC,, James Grauso, ROBIN HATOSY, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., KAVOD PHARMACEUTICALS LLC (F/K/A. RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, F/K/A RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.), Armando Kellum, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MALLINCKRODT, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Jill Nailor, James Nesta, OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Konstantin Ostaficiuk, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., NISHA PATEL, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PFIZER, INC., PLIVA, INC., David Reckenthaler, Richard Rogerson, SANDOZ, INC., STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VERSAPHARM, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC.. Forwarded To: Patrick J. Ahern on 12/15/20 (fdc, ) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by BI-LO HOLDING, LLC, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.. (fb) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S., INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., AKORN, INC., ALVOGEN, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, APOTEX CORP., ARA APRAHAMIAN, AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC., BAUSCH HEALTH AMERICAS, INC., BAUSCH HEALTH US, LLC, BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., JAMES BROWN, David Berthold, CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CITRON PHARMA, LLC, Maureen Cavanaugh, DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., Tracy Sullivan Divalerio, EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD., ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC, EPIC PHARMA LLC, FOUGERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Marc Falkin, G&W LABORATORIES, INC., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA, KEVIN GREEN, GREENSTONE, LLC,, James Grauso, ROBIN HATOSY, HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO, INC., IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC., JUBILANT CADISTA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., KAVOD PHARMACEUTICALS LLC (F/K/A. RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, F/K/A RISING PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.), Armando Kellum, LANNETT COMPANY, INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MALLINCKRODT, INC., MAYNE PHARMA USA, INC., MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN N.V, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Jill Nailor, James Nesta, OCEANSIDE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Konstantin Ostaficiuk, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., NISHA PATEL, PERRIGO NEW YORK, INC., PFIZER, INC., PLIVA, INC., David Reckenthaler, Richard Rogerson, SANDOZ, INC., STRIDES PHARMA, INC.,, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., TARO PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, UDL LABORATORIES, INC., UPSHER-SMITH LABORATORIES, LLC, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, VERSAPHARM, INC., WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., WOCKHARDT USA LLC, ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS (USA), INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14780472.), filed by BI-LO HOLDING, LLC, WINN-DIXIE STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(AHERN, PATRICK) Modified on 12/15/2020 (fb). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mayne Pharma Group Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Alvogen Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMCURE PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD. is a litigant