This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2019 at 07:54:35 (UTC).

Wingard Water Corporation et al v. Covia Holdings Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 Wingard Water Corporation filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Covia Holdings Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven P. Shreder and Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00044

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Steven P. Shreder

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Charles D. Roberts

Wingard Water Corporation

Defendant

Covia Holdings Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

D. Kenyon Williams, Jr.

Attorney at Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (TUL)

320 S Boston Ave, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74103-3706

Bryan J. Nowlin

Attorney at Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (TUL)

320 S Boston Ave, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74103-3706

Amanda M. Lowe

Attorney at Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (TUL)

320 S Boston Ave, Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74103-3706

Defendant Attorneys

Dale E. Cottingham

Attorney at GableGotwals - OKC

211 N Robinson, 15Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Bradley W. Welsh

Attorney at GableGotwals - Tulsa

100 W Fifth St, Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103-4217

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

14 #1

Consent or Reassignment Form

#16

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Directing parties to file their initial disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 5/3/2019 (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • (#15) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-44-RAW. The Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 10:15 a.m. before Judge Steven P. Shreder, and all related deadlines, are hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 4/12/2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amanda M. Lowe on behalf of Wingard Water Corporation and Charles D. Roberts (Lowe, Amanda) Modified on 3/21/2019 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate SCR-Sibelco N.V. by Covia Holdings Corporation (Cottingham, Dale) Modified on 3/8/2019: added Other Affiliate to docket text (nm, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Covia Holdings Corporation (Cottingham, Dale) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bradley W. Welsh on behalf of Covia Holdings Corporation (Welsh, Bradley) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dale E. Cottingham on behalf of Covia Holdings Corporation (Cottingham, Dale) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Covia Holdings Corporation - Served on 2/14/2019. by Wingard Water Corporation; Charles D. Roberts (Nowlin, Bryan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wingard Water Corporation (Nowlin, Bryan) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Kenyon Williams, Jr on behalf of Charles D. Roberts, Wingard Water Corporation (Williams, D.) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bryan J. Nowlin on behalf of Charles D. Roberts, Wingard Water Corporation (Nowlin, Bryan) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Covia Holdings Corporation (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/7/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1241399 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Charles D. Roberts, Wingard Water Corporation (Nowlin, Bryan) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiffs to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiffs' failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 2/14/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Covia Holdings Corporation by Wingard Water Corporation, Charles D. Roberts (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Charles D. Roberts, Wingard Water Corporation (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Covis Holdings L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dale E Cottingham