This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2020 at 12:07:29 (UTC).

Winfield v. NPC International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 Winfield filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NPC International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary A. Fenner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00440

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary A. Fenner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tonika A. Winfield

Defendants

NPC International, Inc.

NPC International, Inc. doing business as Wendy's Old Fashioned Hamburgers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel L. Doyle

Attorney at Doyle & Associates LLC

784 Ann Avenue

Kansas City, KS 66101

Robert A Bruce

Attorney at Doyle & Associates LLC

748 Ann Avenue

Kansas City, KS 66101

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by NPC International, Inc. (Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Automatic Stay of Proceedings) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Order)(Bunck, Stacy) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

3 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#2

(#2) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Tonika A. Winfield. Waiver sent to NPC International, Inc. on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Bruce, Robert) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NPC International, Inc. filed by Daniel L. Doyle on behalf of Tonika A. Winfield. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6885308. Service due by 9/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Doyle, Daniel) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER STAYING CASE. Parties to submit joint status report on or before 10/27/20 and every 90 days thereafter pending resolution of the bankruptcy proceeding. Signed on 7/29/20 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by NPC International, Inc. (Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Automatic Stay of Proceedings) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Order)(Bunck, Stacy) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Tonika A. Winfield. Waiver sent to NPC International, Inc. on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Bruce, Robert) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NPC International, Inc. filed by Daniel L. Doyle on behalf of Tonika A. Winfield. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6885308. Service due by 9/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Doyle, Daniel) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NPC INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert A. Bruce