Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc. et al v. Peninsula, Township of

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendant filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Infante, Joseph) Modified text 10/22/2020 (pjw). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for preliminary injunction by Plaintiffs (Infante, Joseph) Modified text on 10/22/2020 (pjw) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEF in support of MOTION for preliminary injunction #2 filed by Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Infante, Joseph) Modified text on 10/22/2020 (pjw). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by attorney Joseph Infante on behalf of plaintiffs in the amount of $400; receipt number AMIWDC-5835544 (tlbu) Modified text on 10/22/2020 (tlbu). (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (pjw) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Peninsula, Township of (pjw) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc. (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brys Winery, LC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd. (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chateau Operations, Ltd (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grape Harbor Inc. (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Montague Development, LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OV The Farm LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tabone Vineyards, LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Two Lads, LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Villa Mari, LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc. (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gregory M. Meihn on behalf of defendant Peninsula, Township of (Meihn, Gregory) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew T. Wise on behalf of defendant Peninsula, Township of (Wise, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Peninsula Township to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint by defendant Peninsula, Township of (Meihn, Gregory) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS returned executed; Peninsula, Township of served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/30/2020 (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER approving STIPULATION #19 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim & lack of subject matter jurisdiction with brief in support by defendant Peninsula, Township of; (Meihn, Gregory) Modified text on 12/14/2020 (eod) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim & lack of subject matter jurisdiction #22 filed by Peninsula, Township of (Meihn, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction #2 filed by Peninsula, Township of (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Meihn, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition #24 filed by Peninsula, Township of (Meihn, Gregory) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and certificate of service by Peninsula, Township of (Wise, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Peninsula, Township of (Wise, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPLY to response to motion #2 In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC (Ragatzki, Stephen) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Peninsula, Township of filed by Grape Harbor Inc., Villa Mari, LLC, Brys Winery, LC, Montague Development, LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Winery at Black Star Farms LLC, Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., OV The Farm LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Two Lads, LLC, Chateau Operations, Ltd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim & lack of subject matter jurisdiction #22 with certificate of compliance filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Cases) (Infante, Joseph) Modified text on 1/11/2021 (ndj) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER dismissing as moot #22 motion to dismiss; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION for leave to file Sur-reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction with brief in support; by defendant Peninsula, Township of; (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10) (Wise, Matthew) Modified text on 1/15/2021 (ndj). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER denying #32 motion for leave to file; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER denying #2 motion for preliminary injunction; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, #29 with affirmative defenses by Peninsula, Township of (Meihn, Gregory) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/17/2021 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 2/10/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Christopher James Gartman on behalf of plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Gartman, Christopher) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting (Joint Status Report) (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC for Requests to Admit, Interrogatories and Requests to Produce (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Tracy Jane Andrews on behalf of intervenor-defendant Protect the Peninsula, Inc. ; party Protect the Peninsula, Inc. added (Andrews, Tracy) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Protect the Peninsula, Inc. (Andrews, Tracy) Modified text on 2/23/2021 (ndj) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) FIRST MOTION to intervene by movant Protect the Peninsula, Inc.; (Andrews, Tracy) Modified text on 2/23/2021 (ndj) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) BRIEF in support of FIRST MOTION to intervene filed by Protect the Peninsula, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #2 Exhibit B Nadolski Aff, #3 Exhibit C Wunsch Aff, #4 Exhibit D Jacobs Aff, #5 Exhibit E Phillips Aff, #6 Exhibit F Zebell Aff, #7 Exhibit G US v Rutherford County Tenn, #8 Exhibit H Benalcazar v Genoa Twp) (Andrews, Tracy) Modified text on 2/23/2021 (ndj) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re FIRST MOTION to intervene Protect the Peninsula, Inc. intervenor-defendant Protect the Peninsula, Inc. #40 Protect the Peninsula, Inc. filed by Protect the Peninsula, Inc. (Andrews, Tracy) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion,, #41 Protect the Peninsula, Inc. filed by Protect the Peninsula, Inc. (Andrews, Tracy) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Proceedings not recorded) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER:ADR to take place on or before 03/31/2021; discovery to be completed by 9/15/2021; dispositive motions due by 10/15/2021; settlement conference set for 4/20/2022 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 5/16/2022 at 09:30 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 6/7/2022 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) Modified text on 2/25/2021 (ndj) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) RESPONSE in opposition to FIRST MOTION to intervene Protect the Peninsula, Inc. intervenor-defendant Protect the Peninsula, Inc. #40 with certificate of compliance, filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Infante, Joseph) Modified text on 3/3/2021 (ndj) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) JOINT MOTION for joinder and concurrence with Motion to Intervene by defendant Peninsula, Township of; (Meihn, Gregory) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC for Plaintiffs' Answers to Requests for Admissions and Interrogatories (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) REPORT of facilitative mediation held March 6, 2021; mediation is complete (lep) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION to compel by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC; (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) BRIEF in support of MOTION to compel #50 filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to compel #50 filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MOTION for partial summary judgment by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC; (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) BRIEF in support of MOTION for partial summary judgment #53 filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S) (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to compel #50 to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document number #50 : motion hearing is set for 5/13/2021 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MOTION for leave to Supplement Pending Motion to Intervene with Proposed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' State Law Claims and brief in support by movant Protect the Peninsula, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PTP Proposed Motion to Dismiss) (Andrews, Tracy) Modified text on 4/28/2021 (ems). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to Supplement Pending Motion to Intervene with Proposed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' State Law Claims #56 filed by Protect the Peninsula, Inc. (Andrews, Tracy) Modified text on 4/28/2021 (ems). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) RESPONSE TO MOTION to compel #50 with brief in support filed by Peninsula, Township of (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - POS, #3 Exhibit 2 - Email 2/25/21, #4 Exhibit 3 - POS, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plf RFA to Twp, #6 Exhibit 5 - Plf RPD to Twp, #7 Exhibit 6 - Notes on Docs, #8 Exhibit 7) (Wise, Matthew) Modified text on 4/29/2021 (ems). (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MOTION to strike #56 and for Costs by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC; (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) BRIEF in support of MOTION to strike #56 and for Costs #59 filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to strike #56 and for Costs #59 filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for partial summary judgment #53 and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Complaint filed by Peninsula, Township of (Wise, Matthew) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) BRIEF by defendant Peninsula, Township of re #62 in support of response and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Complaint filed by Peninsula, Township of (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-SUP No. 21-Chateau Chantal, #3 Exhibit 2-SUP No. 95-Chateau Chantal, #4 Exhibit 3-1998 Consent Jmt-Chateau Chantal, #5 Exhibit 4-SUP No. 24-Chateau Grand Traverse, #6 Exhibit 5-SUP No. 132 & Amendments-Bowers Harbor, #7 Exhibit 6-SUP No. 34-Black Star Farms, #8 Exhibit 7-1997 PDR Easement-Black Star Farms, #9 Exhibit 8-SUP No. 115 & Amendments-Brys Winery, #10 Exhibit 9-SUP No. 126-Villa Mari, #11 Exhibit 10-SUP No. 73-Tabone Vineyards & Docs, #12 Exhibit 11-SUP No. 118-Oosterhouse Vineyards, #13 Exhibit 12-SUP No. 62-Peninsula Cellars, #14 Exhibit 13-SUP No. 135-Hawthorne Vineyards, #15 Exhibit 14-Nixon v. Webster Twp., 2020 WL 359625) (Wise, Matthew) Modified text on 5/11/2021 (ems). (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for partial summary judgment on Count VIII of Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Complaint (as taken from #62 ) by defendant Peninsula, Township of; (ems) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING regarding document number #50 that was previously set for 5/13/2021 at 1:30 PM; motion hearing is set for 5/17/2021 at 11:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John Stephen Gilliam on behalf of defendant Peninsula, Township of (Gilliam, John) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to strike #56 and for Costs #59 filed by Protect the Peninsula, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Complete Concurrence Discussion) (Andrews, Tracy) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) MINUTES of motion hearing re #50 MOTION to compel filed by Winery at Black Star Farms LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Chateau Operations, Ltd, Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Grape Harbor Inc., Villa Mari, LLC, Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Montague Development, LLC, held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; motion granted in part and denied in part; order to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (sjc) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER on Motion to Compel by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER on Motion to Compel by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabon #67 to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held Monday, May 17, 2021 before Hon. Ray Kent, Magistrate Judge; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 8/23/2021 ; redaction request due 6/14/2021 (Transcriptionist: Rozema, Bonnie L.) (Entered: 05/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) ORDER granting STIPULATION #67 ; terming as moot #50 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) REPLY to response to motion #53 and in Opposition to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Amending Case Management Order by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC, Two Lads, LLC (Infante, Joseph) Modified text and filers on 6/11/2021 (ems). (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 11/15/2021; dispositive motions due by 12/15/2021; settlement conference set for 7/5/2022 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 7/25/2022 at 09:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; bench trial set for 8/16/2022 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC for Second Set of Requests for Admission and Second Set of Requests for Production (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Protective Order by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) PROTECTIVE ORDER; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC for disclosure of expert witnesses, expert report and supplemental production of documents (Infante, Joseph) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (slk). (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) MOTION to compel Deposition of Gregory Meihn by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC; (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) BRIEF in support of MOTION to compel Deposition of Gregory Meihn #77 filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13) (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to compel Deposition of Gregory Meihn #77 filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to compel Deposition of Gregory Meihn #77 to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document number #77 : motion hearing is set for 9/22/2021 at 10:30 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) MOTION for sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule 37 by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC; (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) BRIEF in support of MOTION for sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule 37 #81 filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION for sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule 37 #81 to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) MOTION to compel Second Set of Requests to Produce by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC; (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) BRIEF in support of MOTION to compel Second Set of Requests to Produce #83 filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to compel Second Set of Requests to Produce #83 to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule 37 #81 filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to compel Second Set of Requests to Produce #83 filed by Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document numbers #81 , #83 : motion hearing is set for 9/22/2021 at 10:30 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Amending Case Management Order by plaintiffs Bowers Harbor Vineyard & Winery, Inc., Brys Winery, LC, Chateau Grand Traverse, Ltd., Chateau Operations, Ltd, Grape Harbor Inc., Montague Development, LLC, OV The Farm LLC, Tabone Vineyards, LLC, Two Lads, LLC, Villa Mari, LLC, Wineries of the Old Mission Peninsula Assoc., Winery at Black Star Farms LLC (Infante, Joseph) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less