This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2021 at 07:21:23 (UTC).

Winegard v. Hoshizaki America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Winegard filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Hoshizaki America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and Frederic Block. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05282

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jay Winegard

Defendant

Hoshizaki America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitchell Segal

Attorney at Law Office of Mitchell S. Segal P.C.

1129 Northern Boulevard, Suite 404

Manhasset, NY 11030

Defendant Attorney

Tamara S. Grimm

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer

1500 Market Street, 12Th Floor, East Tower, Philadelphia

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hoshizaki America, Inc.. (Grimm, Tamara) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Hoshizaki America, Inc.. (Grimm, Tamara) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Winegard. Hoshizaki America, Inc. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/12/2020)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Initial Conference will be held in this case on February 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By January 29, 2021, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendant is aware of this conference. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/3/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Hoshizaki America, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hoshizaki America, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13620897 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jay Winegard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder granting motion for extension of time for Defendant to file its answer #8 . The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to January 14, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/27/2020. (Rand, Matthew) (Entered: 12/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Hoshizaki America, Inc.. (Grimm, Tamara) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant's letter application #7 for an extension of time to serve and file an answer is DENIED without prejudice to re-file their application addressed to MJ Kuo who will be handling all pre-trial matters in this litigation. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/18/2020. (Innelli, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Hoshizaki America, Inc.. (Grimm, Tamara) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Winegard. Hoshizaki America, Inc. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Initial Conference will be held in this case on February 3, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge. All counsel are required to attend. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the Access Code 1453850 at the time of the Conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By January 29, 2021, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/PK-discovplan.pdf Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendant is aware of this conference. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/3/2020. (O'Neil-Berven, Ryan) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Hoshizaki America, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hoshizaki America, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13620897 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jay Winegard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Segal, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hoshizaki America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell Segal