This case was last updated from PACER on 01/16/2021 at 10:36:38 (UTC).

Winebrenner Capital Management LLC v. Kraesig

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Winebrenner Capital Management LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kraesig. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David J. Hale. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00772

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David J. Hale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Winebrenner Capital Management LLC

Defendant

Clifford Kraesig

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer L. Bame

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, 32Nd Floor

Louisville, KY 40202-3363

Mekesha H. Montgomery

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Nashville

150 3Rd Avenue South, Suite 1900

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/7/2021: This action stands DISMISSED without prejudice and is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. cc: Counsel (DLW) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/4/2021: Within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, the plaintiff shall file a report advising the Court of the status of this case. cc: Counsel (DLW) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC. Clifford Kraesig served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC. (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Clifford Kraesig. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit B - 2-28-20 Non Compete Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit A - 12-27-19 Non Compete Agreement

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Clifford Kraesig Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3228508., filed by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 12-27-19 Non Compete Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - 2-28-20 Non Compete Agreement) (DJT) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/7/2021: This action stands DISMISSED without prejudice and is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. cc: Counsel (DLW) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/4/2021: Within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, the plaintiff shall file a report advising the Court of the status of this case. cc: Counsel (DLW) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC. Clifford Kraesig served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC. (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Clifford Kraesig. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Clifford Kraesig Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3228508., filed by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 12-27-19 Non Compete Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - 2-28-20 Non Compete Agreement) (DJT) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less