This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2019 at 05:32:58 (UTC).

Winder v. Equifax Information Services LLC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Winder against Equifax Information Services LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05466

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brittney Winder

Defendant

Equifax Information Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew I. Knepper

Attorney at Knepper & Clark, LLC

Suite 170-109, 10040 W. Cheyenne Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89129

David H. Krieger

Attorney at Haines and Krieger, LLC

Suite 130, 8985 S. Eastern Avenue

Henderson, NV 89123

Miles N Clark

Attorney at Knepper & Clark LLC

10040 W. Cheyenne Ave., Suite 170-109

Las Vegas,, NV 89129

Defendant Attorney

Jeremy J. Thompson

Attorney at Clark Hill PLLC

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-55) transferring case to the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by MDL on 12/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#9

(#9) Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-55) transferring case to the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by MDL on 12/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#10

(#10) Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:19-cv-01914. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) MOTION to Stay Case re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Notice, #2 Exhibit B. Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Thompson, Jeremy) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#7

(#7) Text Only MDL Minute Order re CTO-55 transferring case to the Northern District of Georgia. (JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/02/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B Kim v BMW

1 #2

Exhibit A Complaint

10 #1

*Restricted*

5 #1

Exhibit A. Notice

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/30/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/14/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:19-cv-01762; 2:19-cv-01763; 2:19-cv-01764; 2:19-cv-01770; 2:19-cv-01771; 2:19-cv-01772; 2:19-cv-01795; 2:19-cv-01796; 2:19-cv-01799; 2:19-cv-01801; 2:19-cv-01802; 2:19-cv-01803; 2:19-cv-01805; 2:19-cv-01806; 2:19-cv-01821; 2:19-cv-01822; 2:19-cv-01836; 2:19-cv-01840; 2:19-cv-01844; 2:19-cv-01846; 2:19-cv-01847; 2:19-cv-01848; 2:19-cv-01910; 2:19-cv-01912; 2:19-cv-01913; 2:19-cv-01914 by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/01/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit B. Notice

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-803165-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5756218) by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Kim v BMW)(Thompson, Jeremy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #5 MOTION to Stay Case re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC., to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (aar) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:19-cv-01914. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-55) transferring case to the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by MDL on 12/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-55) transferring case to the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by MDL on 12/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Text Only MDL Minute Order re CTO-55 transferring case to the Northern District of Georgia. (JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Interim STATUS REPORT by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Stay Case re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Notice, #2 Exhibit B. Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Thompson, Jeremy) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:19-cv-01762; 2:19-cv-01763; 2:19-cv-01764; 2:19-cv-01770; 2:19-cv-01771; 2:19-cv-01772; 2:19-cv-01795; 2:19-cv-01796; 2:19-cv-01799; 2:19-cv-01801; 2:19-cv-01802; 2:19-cv-01803; 2:19-cv-01805; 2:19-cv-01806; 2:19-cv-01821; 2:19-cv-01822; 2:19-cv-01836; 2:19-cv-01840; 2:19-cv-01844; 2:19-cv-01846; 2:19-cv-01847; 2:19-cv-01848; 2:19-cv-01910; 2:19-cv-01912; 2:19-cv-01913; 2:19-cv-01914 by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/30/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/14/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy) [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-803165-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5756218) by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Kim v BMW)(Thompson, Jeremy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.