This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 12:43:39 (UTC).

Winchester v. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Winchester filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U S , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Embry J. Kidd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00912

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cornelia Winchester

Defendant

Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew J Silvers

Attorney at The Goodwin Firm

801 West Bay Drive, Suite 715

Largo, FL 33770

April Goodwin

Attorney at The Goodwin Firm

801 West Bay Drive, Suite 715

Largo, FL 33777

Defendant Attorneys

Ignacio J. Garcia

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tampa

100 N Tampa St Ste 3600

Tampa, FL 33602-5867

Caroline Engle

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

100 N Tampa St

Tampa, FL 33602

Eliza Neel Horne

Attorney at Johnson Jackson PLLC

100 North Tampa Street, Suite 2310

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2022-CA-002854-O filed in State Court on April 3, 2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19578984 filed by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Exhibit A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit A, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B Notice to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garcia, Ignacio) Modified on 5/18/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit A

1 #3

State Court Other Documents Exhibit A

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B Notice to State Court

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/18/2022. (PML) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/18/2022. (YG) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal and Notice of Appearance by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (Garcia, Ignacio) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (Garcia, Ignacio) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Cornelia Winchester. Related case(s): No (Goodwin, April) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Cornelia Winchester. (Goodwin, April) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/17/22 to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (Garcia, Ignacio) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified text on 6/8/2022 (LDJ). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (Engle, Caroline) Modified text on 6/21/2022 (LDJ). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Engle, Caroline) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#15

(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/27/2022 Discovery due by 3/1/2023 Dispositive motions due by 4/18/2023 Pretrial statement due by 9/14/2023 All other motions due by 8/31/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/5/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/16/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 10/2/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/23/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/28/2022. (YG) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • Docket(#16) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (LDJ) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/27/2022 Discovery due by 3/1/2023 Dispositive motions due by 4/18/2023 Pretrial statement due by 9/14/2023 All other motions due by 8/31/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/5/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/16/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 10/2/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/23/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/28/2022. (YG) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Engle, Caroline) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (Engle, Caroline) Modified text on 6/21/2022 (LDJ). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Remark: Docs. #7, #9 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/7/2022. (EP) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc., may have until and through June 17, 2022, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/8/2022. (Kidd, Embry) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/17/22 to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (Garcia, Ignacio) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified text on 6/8/2022 (LDJ). (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Cornelia Winchester. (Goodwin, April) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Cornelia Winchester. Related case(s): No (Goodwin, April) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (Garcia, Ignacio) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketReset deadline for Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. Answer due by 6/7/2022. (LDJ) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc., may have until and through June 7, 2022, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/20/2022. (IRM) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal and Notice of Appearance by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc.. (Garcia, Ignacio) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 5/18/2022. (YG) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/18/2022. (PML) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-0912-RBD-EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2022-CA-002854-O filed in State Court on April 3, 2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19578984 filed by Walt Disney Parks and Resorts U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Exhibit A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit A, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B Notice to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garcia, Ignacio) Modified on 5/18/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC DBA MAGIC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ignacio J. Garcia