This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2021 at 08:49:14 (UTC).

Wimberley et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Wimberley filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-80832

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mr. David Cedric Wimberley

Defendants

Novitium Pharma, LLC

Sam's West, Inc.

Sandoz, Inc.

Sanofi S.A.

APPCO Pharma, LLC

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Five Crescent Drive

Philadelphia, PA 19112

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Denton Pharma, Inc.

Chattem, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

Golden State Medical Supply, Inc.

Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U. S. LLC

Perrigo Company

Granules USA, Inc.

Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

Geri-Care

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew C. Kolb

Attorney at Kolb Law Firm, L.L.C.

8480 Bluebonnet Boulevard, Suite D

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley re #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,,,, Proposed Summons (Kolb, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley re #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,,,, Proposed Summons (Kolb, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Striking #6 Notice (Other) filed by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley, #7 Notice (Other) filed by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley (Kolb, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#7

(#7) STRICKEN NOTICE by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley re #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,,,, Proposed Summons for Denton Pharma Inc (Kolb, Andrew) Modified per DE#9 Notice of Striking on 6/29/2021 (ebz). (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#6

(#6) STRICKEN NOTICE by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley re #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,,,, Proposed Summons for Appco Pharma LLC (Kolb, Andrew) Modified per DE#9 Notice of Striking on 6/29/2021 (ebz). (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against APPCO Pharma, LLC, Ajanta Pharma USA Inc., Apotex Corp, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corp., Boehringer Ingelheim International (GmbH), Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation, CVS Caremark Corp., CVS Health Co., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Denton Pharma, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Duane Reade, Inc., Geri-Care, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline plc, Golden State Medical Supply, Inc., Granules USA, Inc., L. Perrigo Co., Novitium Pharma, LLC, Perrigo Company, Perrigo Company PLC, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Sam's West, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U. S. LLC, Strides Pharma, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Mary S. Wimberley, David Cedric Wimberley.(Kolb, Andrew) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to APPCO Pharma, LLC, Denton Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley re #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,,,, Proposed Summons (Kolb, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley re #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,,,, Proposed Summons (Kolb, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Striking #6 Notice (Other) filed by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley, #7 Notice (Other) filed by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley (Kolb, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to APPCO Pharma, LLC, Denton Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STRICKEN NOTICE by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley re #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,,,, Proposed Summons for Denton Pharma Inc (Kolb, Andrew) Modified per DE#9 Notice of Striking on 6/29/2021 (ebz). (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STRICKEN NOTICE by David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley re #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,,,, Proposed Summons for Appco Pharma LLC (Kolb, Andrew) Modified per DE#9 Notice of Striking on 6/29/2021 (ebz). (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against APPCO Pharma, LLC, Ajanta Pharma USA Inc., Apotex Corp, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corp., Boehringer Ingelheim International (GmbH), Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation, CVS Caremark Corp., CVS Health Co., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Denton Pharma, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Duane Reade, Inc., Geri-Care, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline plc, Golden State Medical Supply, Inc., Granules USA, Inc., L. Perrigo Co., Novitium Pharma, LLC, Perrigo Company, Perrigo Company PLC, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Sam's West, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U. S. LLC, Strides Pharma, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Mary S. Wimberley, David Cedric Wimberley.(Kolb, Andrew) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket(#3) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-80832-RLR Wimberley et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corp. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14671537, filed by Mary S. Wimberley, David Cedric Wimberley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kolb, Andrew) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Denton Pharma Inc. dba Northwind Pharmaceuticals is a litigant

Latest cases where Geri-Care is a litigant

Latest cases where Granules USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Novitium Pharma LLC is a litigant