This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 08:19:29 (UTC).

Wilver Duarte v. St. John Baptist De La Salle School et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Wilver Duarte filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against St John Baptist De La Salle School. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09772

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilver Duarte

Defendants

St. John Baptist De La Salle School

The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles

Archdiocese of Los Angeles

Archdiocese of Los Angeles Education and Welfare Corporation

DOES 1 to 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lily Tielle Shu

Attorney at Lavi and Ebrahimian LLP

8889 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Nassir N Ebrahimian

Attorney at Lavi and Ebrahimian LLP

8889 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Victoria Grace Carthorn

Attorney at Lavi and Ebrahimian LLP

8889 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony J Bellone

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Debra Ellwood Meppen

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Taline Markarian

Attorney at Gordon and Rees Scully Mansukhani

633 West 5Th Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Summons

1 #3

Exhibit First Amended Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION. (Markarian, Taline) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION, (Markarian, Taline) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION, of NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on 12/17/2021. (Markarian, Taline) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Taline Markarian counsel for Defendant ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION. Changing address to Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP, 633 W. Fifth Street, 52nd Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendant ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION. (Markarian, Taline) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION.(Markarian, Taline) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/18/2022. (tj) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/18/2022. (tj) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION.(Markarian, Taline) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Taline Markarian counsel for Defendant ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION. Changing address to Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP, 633 W. Fifth Street, 52nd Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendant ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION. (Markarian, Taline) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION, of NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on 12/17/2021. (Markarian, Taline) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNON CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Wilver Duarte, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Wilver Duarte in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/16/2021, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION, (Markarian, Taline) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION. (Markarian, Taline) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV22442 Receipt No: ACACDC-32500488 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit First Amended Complaint) (Attorney Taline Markarian added to party ST. JOHN BAPTIST DE LA SALLE SCHOOL; THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES; ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION(pty:dft))(Markarian, Taline) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES THE is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHIBISHOP OF LOS is a litigant