This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:45:07 (UTC).

Wilson v. Wolf et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Wilson filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against Wolf. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William M. Ray, II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03428

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melliza S. Wilson

Defendants

Kenneth Cuccinelli

Shineka Miller

Chad Wolf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth S Levine

Attorney at Levine & Eskandari, LLC

Po Box 674138

Marietta, GA 30006-0069

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/21/2020. (ah) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#6

(#6) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (ah) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ah) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Melliza S. Wilson (Levine, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Electronic Summons Issued as to Shineka Miller. (ah) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Melliza S. Wilson Request to Issue Corrected Summons for Shineka Miller, FOD (Levine, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/21/2020. (ah) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Byung J. Pak. (eop) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Shineka Miller. (eop) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli. (eop) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Chad Wolf. (eop) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Melliza S. Wilson. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-10041618) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less