This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2019 at 07:34:33 (UTC).

Wilson v. Williams et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Wilson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Williams. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia D. Barksdale and Marcia Morales Howard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00822

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

kelli wilson

Defendants

Mike Williams

m e pfenning

c w jackson

R. A. Bias

R.A. Bias

C.W. Jackson

M.E. Pfenning

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew R. Kachergus

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Jesse B. Wilkison

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Camille Elizabeth Sheppard

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Bryan E. DeMaggio

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

William J. Sheppard

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Elizabeth Louise White

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen J. Powell

Attorney at City of Jacksonville

St James Bldg - Suite 480, 117 W Duval St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Brett Gordon Mereness

Attorney at Office of General Counsel

117 W Duval St Ste 480

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Paul A. Daragjati

Attorney at Paul Daragjati, PLC

5530 Beach Blvd.

Jacksonville, FL 32207

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by R.A. Bias, C.W. Jackson, M.E. Pfenning.(Daragjati, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2019)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by R.A. Bias, C.W. Jackson, M.E. Pfenning. (Daragjati, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2019)

17 #2

Court Docket

17 #1

Mediation Report Form

#17

(#17) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements due 9/3/2019. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/30/2020. Dispositive motions due by 11/20/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 5/3/2021 at 09:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice by Mike Williams. (Mereness, Brett) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#15

(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sheppard, Camille) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kelli Wilson. (Sheppard, Camille) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV, V and VI of Complaint filed by Kelli Wilson. (Sheppard, Camille) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to M.E. Pfenning. (RH) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to C.W. Jackson. (RH) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to R.A. Bias. (RH) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit Summons for Williams

1 #4

Exhibit Summons for Pfenning

1 #3

Exhibit Summons for Jackson

1 #2

Exhibit Summons for Bias

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#19) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by R.A. Bias, C.W. Jackson, M.E. Pfenning.(Daragjati, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by R.A. Bias, C.W. Jackson, M.E. Pfenning.(Daragjati, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by R.A. Bias, C.W. Jackson, M.E. Pfenning. (Daragjati, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • (#20) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (RH) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements due 9/3/2019. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/30/2020. Dispositive motions due by 11/20/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 5/3/2021 at 09:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice by Mike Williams. (Mereness, Brett) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sheppard, Camille) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kelli Wilson. (Sheppard, Camille) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV, V and VI of Complaint filed by Kelli Wilson. (Sheppard, Camille) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RETURN of service executed on 7/19/19 by Kelli Wilson as to M.E. Pfenning. (Kachergus, Matthew) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RETURN of service executed on 7/25/19 by Kelli Wilson as to C.W. Jackson. (Kachergus, Matthew) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN of service executed on 07/19/19 by Kelli Wilson as to R.A. Bias. (Kachergus, Matthew) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN of service executed on 07/19/19 by Kelli Wilson as to Mike Williams. (Kachergus, Matthew) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV, V and VI of Complaint by Mike Williams. (Mereness, Brett) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS issued as to Mike Williams. (RH) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued as to M.E. Pfenning. (RH) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS issued as to C.W. Jackson. (RH) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued as to R.A. Bias. (RH) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-822-J-34PDB. (SJB) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against R.A. Bias, Mike Williams, C.W. Jackson, M.E. Pfenning with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15676910) filed by Kelli Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons for Bias, #3 Exhibit Summons for Jackson, #4 Exhibit Summons for Pfenning, #5 Exhibit Summons for Williams)(Kachergus, Matthew) Modified on 7/12/2019 to edit text (RH). (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.