This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2019 at 07:47:54 (UTC).

Wilson v. White et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Wilson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against White. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00441

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyrone Wilson

Meridian, MS 39307

Defendants

Unknown Gamble

Trinity Food Services

Bert Unknown

Unknown White

Centurion of Mississippi

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Officer "Unknown" White Kitchen Supervisor on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#12

(#12) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Officer "Unknown" Gamble - Kitchen Supervisor on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#11

(#11) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Officer Bert "Unknown"- Kitchen Supervisor on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Trinity Food Services on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

9 #5

Waiver of Service

9 #4

Notice of Lawsuit-Trinity Food Services

9 #3

Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Bert Unknown Kitchen Supervisor

9 #2

Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Unknown Gamble Kitchen Supervisor

9 #1

Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Unknown White Kitchen Supervisor

#9

(#9) ORDER, Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit for Defendants. The Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/19/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Unknown White Kitchen Supervisor, #2 Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Unknown Gamble Kitchen Supervisor, #3 Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Bert Unknown Kitchen Supervisor, #4 Notice of Lawsuit-Trinity Food Services, #5 Waiver of Service) (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER, the Court will construe Plaintiff's request to "remove" Centurion of Mississippi as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Centurion of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/19/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) Response to Order re #6 ORDER, on or before August 9, 2019, Plaintiff must file a written response to specifically state how Defendant Centurion of Mississippi violated Plaintiff's constitutional rights, including dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 07/18/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) filed by Tyrone Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER, on or before August 9, 2019, Plaintiff must file a written response to specifically state how Defendant Centurion of Mississippi violated Plaintiff's constitutional rights, including dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 07/18/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Tyrone Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 06/25/2019. (CS) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Officer "Unknown" White Kitchen Supervisor on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Officer "Unknown" Gamble - Kitchen Supervisor on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Officer Bert "Unknown"- Kitchen Supervisor on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Trinity Food Services on 08/19/2019. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit for Defendants. The Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/19/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Unknown White Kitchen Supervisor, #2 Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Unknown Gamble Kitchen Supervisor, #3 Notice of Lawsuit-Officer Bert Unknown Kitchen Supervisor, #4 Notice of Lawsuit-Trinity Food Services, #5 Waiver of Service) (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER, the Court will construe Plaintiff's request to "remove" Centurion of Mississippi as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Centurion of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 08/19/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Response to Order re #6 ORDER, on or before August 9, 2019, Plaintiff must file a written response to specifically state how Defendant Centurion of Mississippi violated Plaintiff's constitutional rights, including dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 07/18/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) filed by Tyrone Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER, on or before August 9, 2019, Plaintiff must file a written response to specifically state how Defendant Centurion of Mississippi violated Plaintiff's constitutional rights, including dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 07/18/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 07/18/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Premier Supply Link] (CS) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Tyrone Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 06/25/2019. (CS) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tyrone Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Centurion of Mississippi, Unknown Gamble, Trinity Food Services, Bert Unknown, Unknown White, filed by Tyrone Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment mailed to Tyrone Wilson,#202311,East MS Correctional Facility,4A-103,10641 Hwy 80 West,Meridian, MS 39307.) (LAT) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less