This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 10:09:16 (UTC).

Myranda Wilson v. Victorias Secret Stores, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Myranda Wilson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Victorias Secret Stores, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Manuel L. Real and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02206

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manuel L. Real

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Myranda Wilson

Myranda Golphin

Defendants

Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC

DOES

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Victorias Secret Stores, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christina Marie Coleman

Attorney at Law Offices of Christina Coleman APC

5514 Wilshire Boulevard Floor 1

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant Attorneys

Daphne Pierre Bishop

Attorney at Carothers DiSante and Freudenberger LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 5150

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Emily Anne Papania

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease LLP

301 East Fourth Street Suite 3500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Brent Mathew Giddens

Attorney at Carothers Disante and Freudenberger LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 5150

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff Myranda Wilson. (Coleman, Christina) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING PRE-TRIAL & TRIAL DATES by Judge Manuel L. Real. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that this action is hereby placed on calendar for FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on FEBRUARY 3, 2020 AT 11:00 A.M. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit Lists and Witness Lists shall be filed and served on or before JANUARY 13, 2020, which date will also serve as the discovery cut-off date in this action. There is no Motion Cut-Off Date set. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER shall be lodged with this Court on or before JANUARY 27, 2020. JURY TRIAL DATE is set as MARCH 3, 2020 AT 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cch) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#8

(#8) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Myranda Wilson.. (Coleman, Christina) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Victorias Secret Stores, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on March 27, 2019. (Bishop, Daphne) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on March 25, 2019. (Bishop, Daphne) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, identifying Retail Store Operations, Inc., Intimate Brands Holdings, LLC; Intimate Brands, Inc.; L Brands, Inc.. (Bishop, Daphne) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Bishop, Daphne) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit -4 L Brands 10-K

1 #3

Exhibit -3 Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC Answer to Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit -2 Superior Court Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit -1 Notice to State Court re Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court-Central, case number 18STCV05344 Receipt No: 0973-23433809 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 Notice to State Court re Removal, #2 Exhibit -2 Superior Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit -3 Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit -4 L Brands 10-K) (Attorney Daphne Pierre Bishop added to party Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC(pty:dft))(Bishop, Daphne) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff Myranda Wilson. (Coleman, Christina) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • (#10) ORDER RE JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court ORDERS the parties in the above-entitled action to file a joint status report on or before July 3, 2019. The status report shall not exceed five pages. The parties shall address the following: 1) Status of the case; 2) Whether the parties have attempted to settle the case. If the parties have not attempted to settle the case, why the parties have not yet attempted to do so. And, if the parties have attempted to settle, what the issue was and why the case did not settle. 3) Each sides' suggestion of procedures that would facilitate resolution of this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING PRE-TRIAL & TRIAL DATES by Judge Manuel L. Real. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that this action is hereby placed on calendar for FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on FEBRUARY 3, 2020 AT 11:00 A.M. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit Lists and Witness Lists shall be filed and served on or before JANUARY 13, 2020, which date will also serve as the discovery cut-off date in this action. There is no Motion Cut-Off Date set. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER shall be lodged with this Court on or before JANUARY 27, 2020. JURY TRIAL DATE is set as MARCH 3, 2020 AT 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cch) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Myranda Wilson.. (Coleman, Christina) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Victorias Secret Stores, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on March 27, 2019. (Bishop, Daphne) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on March 25, 2019. (Bishop, Daphne) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Victorias Secret Stores, LLC. Filed in State Court on 3/22/2019 Submitted with Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Victorias Secret Stores, LLC.Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Myranda Wilson. Filed in State Court on 2/15/2019 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC, identifying Retail Store Operations, Inc., Intimate Brands Holdings, LLC; Intimate Brands, Inc.; L Brands, Inc.. (Bishop, Daphne) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Bishop, Daphne) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court-Central, case number 18STCV05344 Receipt No: 0973-23433809 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 Notice to State Court re Removal, #2 Exhibit -2 Superior Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit -3 Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit -4 L Brands 10-K) (Attorney Daphne Pierre Bishop added to party Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC(pty:dft))(Bishop, Daphne) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Anne Papania

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent M. Giddens