Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 09:13:37 (UTC).

WILSON v. STATE OF MAINE

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 WILSON filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF MAINE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00320

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHRISTOPHER WILSON

Warren, ME 04864

Respondent

STATE OF MAINE

Not Classified By Court

MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DONALD W. MACOMBER

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

626-8800

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Exhibit State Court Record

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/20/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

1 #16

Example 16

1 #15

Example 15

1 #14

Example 14

1 #12

Example 12

1 #11

Example 11

1 #10

Example 10

1 #9

Example 9

1 #8

Example 8

1 #7

Example 7

1 #6

Example 6

1 #5

Example 5

1 #4

Example 4

1 #3

Example 3

1 #2

Example 2

1 #1

Example 1

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CHRISTOPHER WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Example 1, #2 Example 2, #3 Example 3, #4 Example 4, #5 Example 5, #6 Example 6, #7 Example 7, #8 Example 8, #9 Example 9, #10 Example 10, #11 Example 11, #12 Example 12, #13 Example 13, #14 Example 14, #15 Example 15, #16 Example 16, #17 envelope)(bfa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT RECORD (1 binder) filed in paper in the Clerk's Office by STATE OF MAINE. (jgd) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER terminating #4 Order to Show Cause By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Received from CHRISTOPHER WILSON: Amount Paid: 5.00. Receipt Number: 220001444. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Habeas Filing Fee. Date Paid: 9/9/2020 (jwr) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER/RESPONSE/REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by STATE OF MAINE. Reply due by 11/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(MACOMBER, DONALD) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE TO #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by CHRISTOPHER WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Victoria Sheehan, #2 Order to Show Cause, #3 Envelope)(tcs) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/20/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Filing Fee or IFP Application due by 9/24/2020. (MFS) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON PETITIONER'S FILING. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO ANSWER #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 11/9/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CHRISTOPHER WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Example 1, #2 Example 2, #3 Example 3, #4 Example 4, #5 Example 5, #6 Example 6, #7 Example 7, #8 Example 8, #9 Example 9, #10 Example 10, #11 Example 11, #12 Example 12, #13 Example 13, #14 Example 14, #15 Example 15, #16 Example 16, #17 envelope)(bfa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONALD W. MACOMBER