This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2020 at 07:51:46 (UTC).

Wilson v. Segovia et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 Wilson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Segovia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mitchell D. Dembin and Larry Alan Burns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02254

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mitchell D. Dembin

Presiding Judge

Larry Alan Burns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lucious Wilson

Tehachapi, CA 93561

Defendants

C/O Hultz

C/O Demesci

Sgt. Segovia

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lucious Wilson. (jms). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Demesci, Hultz, Segovia, filed by Lucious Wilson.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2254-LAB-MDD. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(jrd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

4 #1

IFP Letter

#4

(#4) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: #1 IFP Letter) (jdt) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Granting Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ); and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Complaint and Summons Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). The Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP (ECF No. 2). The Court orders the Secretary of the CDCR, or his designee, to collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350 filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the account in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of this Order on Ralph Diaz, Secretary, CDCR. The Court directs the Clerk to issue a summons as to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1) and forward it to Plaintiff's counsel along with a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 for each Defendant. The Court orders the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the Complaint and summons upon the Defendants as directed by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/10/2019. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR) (IFP package mailed to Plaintiff.) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (jdt) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: #1 IFP Letter) (jdt) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Granting Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ); and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Complaint and Summons Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). The Court grants Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP (ECF No. 2). The Court orders the Secretary of the CDCR, or his designee, to collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350 filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the account in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of this Order on Ralph Diaz, Secretary, CDCR. The Court directs the Clerk to issue a summons as to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1) and forward it to Plaintiff's counsel along with a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 for each Defendant. The Court orders the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the Complaint and summons upon the Defendants as directed by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/10/2019. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR) (IFP package mailed to Plaintiff.) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Certified Copy to USM) (jdt) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lucious Wilson. (jms). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Demesci, Hultz, Segovia, filed by Lucious Wilson.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2254-LAB-MDD. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(jrd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.