This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 09:48:14 (UTC).

Wilson v. Monsanto Co

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Wilson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02493

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Wilson

Defendant

Monsanto Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John C. Enochs

Attorney at Morris Bart, P.L.C.

601 Poydras Street, 24Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard Lee Root

Attorney at Morris Bart. LLC

601 Poydras Street, 24Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorney

Jennise Walker-Stubbs

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

1 #2

Proposed summons/writ

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monsanto Co. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-327) in MDL No. 2741, IN RE: Roundup Products Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of California upon request of the record. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 327, directing transfer to Northern District of California, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 2741. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff William Wilson] byMonsanto Co.. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Co. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Co.. [RE: Plaintiff William Wilson] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Co. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Co.. [RE: Plaintiff William Wilson] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Co. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Co.. [RE: Plaintiff William Wilson] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Co. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Co.. [RE: Plaintiff William Wilson] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff William Wilson] byMonsanto Co.. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Western, 3:22-cv-00857, Wilson v. Monsanto Co, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-02493-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 327 cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2022) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 3:22-cv-00857. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 327, directing transfer to Northern District of California, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 2741. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-327) in MDL No. 2741, IN RE: Roundup Products Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of California upon request of the record. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monsanto Co. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5048426) filed by William Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney John C Enochs added to party William Wilson(pty:pla))(aty,Enochs, John) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennise Walker-Stubbs