This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2022 at 09:27:55 (UTC).

Wilson v. Mid-Century Insurance

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Wilson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Mid-Century Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David Barlow and Jared C. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00454

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Barlow

Referral Judge

Jared C. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher J Wilson

Defendant

Mid-Century Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brody J. Valerga

Attorney at VALERGA PLLC

357 S 200 E #101

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorneys

Marshall J. Hendrickson

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Ryan M. Stephens

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Defendant Mid-Century Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (ks) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil File Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A in Support of Petition for Removal

2 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B in Support of Petition for Removal

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff(s) must propose a schedule to Defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report, available on the District of Utahs website at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/civil-case-scheduling, within fourteen (14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 07/11/2022. (jl) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Mid-Century Insurance, Plaintiff Christopher J Wilson. (nl) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return #the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case.Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Mid-Century Insurance, Plaintiff Christopher J Wilson. Form due by 8/3/2022. (mh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Mid-Century Insurance. (Stephens, Ryan) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#9

(#9) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Valerga, Brody) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/15/2023. Motions due by 8/15/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 08/17/2022. (mh) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/15/2023. Motions due by 8/15/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 08/17/2022. (mh) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Valerga, Brody) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A). Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 08/05/2022. (dah) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Docket(#7) The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment Forms has now passed. One or more of the parties failed to file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand filed by Mid-Century Insurance. (Stephens, Ryan) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return #the form on this link To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form and place Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Please do not file the Consent Form in the case.Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Mid-Century Insurance, Plaintiff Christopher J Wilson. Form due by 8/3/2022. (mh) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Mid-Century Insurance, Plaintiff Christopher J Wilson. (nl) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff(s) must propose a schedule to Defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report, available on the District of Utahs website at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/civil-case-scheduling, within fourteen (14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 07/11/2022. (jl) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 220903788, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4386531) filed by Mid-Century Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil File Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A in Support of Petition for Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B in Support of Petition for Removal) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Stephens, Ryan) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Defendant Mid-Century Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402. by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (ks) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Stephens

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshall J. Hendrickson