This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2021 at 09:53:40 (UTC).

Wilson v. M.D.O.C. et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Wilson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against M D O C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy, Debra M. Brown and Glen H. Davidson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judges

Debra M. Brown

Glen H. Davidson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randy Wilson

Parchman, MS 38738

Defendants

Inmate Monty G # ?

M.D.O.C. Commissioner Burl Cain

Tim Morris

David Honeycutt

M.D.O.C.

Nurse Rease

James Carter #26035

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Brittney S. Eakins

Attorney at Mississippi Attorney General's Office

550 High Street, Suite 1100

Jackson, MS 39205

Elgin K. Walley

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

P.O. Box 220, 550 High St.

Jackson, MS 39205

John Chadwick Williams

Attorney at MISSISSIPPI ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

550 High Street, Suite 1100, Post Office Box 220

Jackson, MS 39205-0220

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROCESS and SCHEDULING ORDER - PRISONER, M.D.O.C. Commissioner Burl Cain answer due 8/2/2021; David Honeycutt answer due 8/2/2021; M.D.O.C. answer due 8/2/2021; Tim Morris answer due 8/2/2021; Nurse Rease answer due 8/2/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2021. Exhibit List due by 9/30/2021. Witness List due by 9/30/2021. Motions due by 2/2/2022. Discovery due by 8/31/2021. Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/6/2022 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Counsel for the Mississippi Department of Corrections ("MDOC")has agreed to accept Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/8/21. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE Cancelling Spears Hearing set for July 27, 2021. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order Setting Spears Hearing. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order Setting Spears Hearing. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Spears Hearing set for 7/27/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/1/2021. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/1/2021. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLINATION to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. District Judge Debra M. Brown no longer assigned to the case. (cb) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/1/2021) (cb).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 6/19/2021. Signed by Clerk on 5/20/2021. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy Wilson. (cb) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, filed by Randy Wilson. (cb) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M.D.O.C. is a litigant