This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:39:06 (UTC).

Wilson v. Henson et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Wilson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Henson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00516

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryant E Wilson

Marion, IN 46952

Defendants

Nate Meeks

Scott Hunt

Tyler Small

Reggie Nevels

Mike Henson

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Letter from Bryant Wilson. (mrm) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERING Plaintiff to immediately pay $3.80 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 12/18/2019. (Copy mailed to Pro Se and as directed in Order)(mrm) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close case number 2:19-cv-467 and open a new case with these filings in the Fort Wayne Division due to improper venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/6/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Bryant E Wilson. (rmf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Mike Henson, Scott Hunt, Nate Meeks, Reggie Nevels, Tyler Small, filed by Bryant E Wilson. (No proposed summons or USM forms submitted) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#6) Initial Partial Filing fee received: $14.80, receipt number INN1011045. (lhc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Bryant Wilson. (mrm) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERING Plaintiff to immediately pay $3.80 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 12/18/2019. (Copy mailed to Pro Se and as directed in Order)(mrm) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close case number 2:19-cv-467 and open a new case with these filings in the Fort Wayne Division due to improper venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/6/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Bryant E Wilson. (rmf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Mike Henson, Scott Hunt, Nate Meeks, Reggie Nevels, Tyler Small, filed by Bryant E Wilson. (No proposed summons or USM forms submitted) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.