This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:00:40 (UTC).

Wilson v. Henson et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Wilson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Henson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Martin and Philip P Simon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00467

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E Martin

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryant E Wilson

Marion, IN 46952

Defendants

Nate Meeks

Scott Hunt

Tyler Small

Reggie Nevels

Mike Henson

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Bryant E Wilson. (rmf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the Fort Wayne Division due to improper venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/6/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) Modified on 12/9/2019 to add FW case number 1:19cv516.(lhc). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Mike Henson, Scott Hunt, Nate Meeks, Reggie Nevels, Tyler Small, filed by Bryant E Wilson. (No proposed summons or USM forms submitted) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the Fort Wayne Division due to improper venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/6/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) Modified on 12/9/2019 to add FW case number 1:19cv516.(lhc). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Bryant E Wilson. (rmf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Mike Henson, Scott Hunt, Nate Meeks, Reggie Nevels, Tyler Small, filed by Bryant E Wilson. (No proposed summons or USM forms submitted) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmf) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.