This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2020 at 09:01:25 (UTC).

Wilson v. Fleck et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Wilson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Fleck. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gershwin A. Drain and Kimberly G. Altman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-12874

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gershwin A. Drain

Referral Judge

Kimberly G. Altman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zachary Wilson

Defendants

Melvin J. Fleck

Progressive Marathon Insurance Company

Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground

Routeteam Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Route Team Inc.

Geico Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald S. Marvin

Attorney at The Sam Bernstein Law Firm, PLLC

31731 Northwestern Highway, Ste. 333

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin J. Plagens

Attorney at Kopka, Pinkus, Dolin & Eads

33533 W. Twelve Mile Road, Suite 350

Farmington Hills, MI 48331

Tara S. Cannatella

Attorney at Hutchinson Cannatella P.C.

1001 Woodward Avenue, Suite 900

Detroit, MI 48226

Michael T. Fox

Attorney at Law Offices of Valentine J. Temrowski

24055 Jefferson, Suite 102

St. Clair Shores, MI 48080

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#22

(#22) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#21

(#21) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Melvin J. Fleck (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#20

(#20) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Geico Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO GEICO INDEMINITY INSURANCE COMPANY for Geico Indemnity Company. (Fox, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#19

(#19) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Zachary Wilson (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#18

(#18) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Melvin J. Fleck. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#15

(#15) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Routeteam Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Route Team Inc. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Geico Indemnity Company. (Fox, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Geico Indemnity Company served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 11/15/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Progressive Marathon Insurance Company served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Routeteam Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Route Team Inc. served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Melvin J. Fleck served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Initial Disclosure/witness list WITNESS LIST by Zachary Wilson (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Zachary Wilson against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8131521 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Lapeer - County Where Action Arose: out of state - County of 1st Defendant: Lucas. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Melvin J. Fleck (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Geico Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO GEICO INDEMINITY INSURANCE COMPANY for Geico Indemnity Company. (Fox, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Zachary Wilson (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Melvin J. Fleck. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Routeteam Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Route Team Inc. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Routeteam Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Route Team Inc.. (Plagens, Kevin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Geico Indemnity Company. (Fox, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Geico Indemnity Company served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 11/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Progressive Marathon Insurance Company served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. d/b/a Fedex Ground served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Routeteam Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Route Team Inc. served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Melvin J. Fleck served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Disclosure/witness list WITNESS LIST by Zachary Wilson (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Zachary Wilson against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8131521 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Lapeer - County Where Action Arose: out of state - County of 1st Defendant: Lucas. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Marvin, Ronald) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Marathon Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald S. Marvin