This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2021 at 09:34:47 (UTC).

Wilson v. Equipment Options Direct, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Wilson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Equipment Options Direct, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristi H. Johnson and Michael T. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristi H. Johnson

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Todd Wilson

Defendants

Coleman Boyd

Equipment Options Direct, LLC

John Does 1-3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Ashley Ogden

Attorney at OGDEN & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

500 East Capitol Street, Suite 3

Jackson, MS 39201

Defendant Attorneys

M. James Weems

Attorney at DANIEL, COKER, HORTON & BELL - Jackson

P.O. Box 1084, 4400 Old Canton Road, Suite 400 (39211)

Jackson, MS 39215-1084

Robert Brantley Adams

Attorney at DANIEL, COKER, HORTON & BELL - Jackson

P.O. Box 1084, 4400 Old Canton Road, Suite 400 (39211)

Jackson, MS 39215-1084

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER denying #4 Motion to Remand. Defendant Coleman Boyd is dismissed from this action as improperly joined. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 2/25/2021 (srd) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Service of PRE-DISCOVERY Disclosure by Michael Todd Wilson (Ogden, James) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Equipment Options Direct, LLC (Weems, M.) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#9

(#9) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 3/19/21.(KPM) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#7

(#7) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Michael Todd Wilson (Ogden, James) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Equipment Options Direct, LLC (Adams, Robert) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 29, 2021 (KPM) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

4 #2

Exhibit Affidavit

4 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#4

(#4) MOTION to Remand by Michael Todd Wilson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Ogden, James) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Equipment Options Direct, LLC.(Weems, M.) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by M. James Weems on behalf of Equipment Options Direct, LLC (Weems, M.) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit C - Correspondence from Plaintiff

1 #2

Exhibit A - Hinds County Civil Case File

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equipment Options Direct, LLC from Hinds County Circuit Court, case number 25CI1:20-cv-721-EFP. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4459216) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Hinds County Civil Case File, #3 Exhibit B - Electronic Articles of Organization, #4 Exhibit C - Correspondence from Plaintiff)(PG) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Service of PRE-DISCOVERY Disclosure by Michael Todd Wilson (Ogden, James) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Equipment Options Direct, LLC (Weems, M.) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 3/19/21.(KPM) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying #4 Motion to Remand. Defendant Coleman Boyd is dismissed from this action as improperly joined. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 2/25/2021 (srd) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Michael Todd Wilson (Ogden, James) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Equipment Options Direct, LLC (Adams, Robert) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 29, 2021 (KPM) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand by Michael Todd Wilson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Ogden, James) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Equipment Options Direct, LLC.(Weems, M.) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by M. James Weems on behalf of Equipment Options Direct, LLC (Weems, M.) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equipment Options Direct, LLC from Hinds County Circuit Court, case number 25CI1:20-cv-721-EFP. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4459216) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Hinds County Civil Case File, #3 Exhibit B - Electronic Articles of Organization, #4 Exhibit C - Correspondence from Plaintiff)(PG) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer M. James Weems

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert B. Adams