This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2020 at 09:03:19 (UTC).

WILSON v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 WILSON filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY TORRESEN and JOHN H. RICH III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY TORRESEN

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LYNETT S WILSON

Respondent

DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERT F. STONE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT F. STONE, ESQ.

P.O. Box 401

Conway, MA 01373

Respondent Attorney

MARGARET JANTZEN

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION to participate in 2/25/2020 telephone conference pending Pro Hac Vice Application by LYNETT S WILSON Responses due by 3/16/2020. (STONE, ROBERT) Modified on 2/24/2020 to clean up text (mnd). (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Attorney Margaret Jantzen to Withdraw as Attorney by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS Responses due by 2/24/2020. (OSBORN, JOHN) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN G. OSBORN on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (OSBORN, JOHN) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #23

order on motion to extend time to file brief

1 #22

petitioner's certificate of service re: compliance of motion

1 #21

petitioner's objection to motion to dismiss or transfer

1 #20

respondent's motion to dismiss or transfer

1 #19

petitioner's certificate of interest

1 #18

petitioner's motion to extend time to file brief

1 #17

respondent's docketing statement

1 #14

petitioner's entry of appearance

1 #13

petitioner's docketing statement

1 #7

Robert Stone's entry of appearance

1 #4

petitioner's docketing statement

1 #3

petition for review

1 #2

notice of docketing

1 #1

docket

#1

(#1) Case transferred in from District of US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit; Case Number 19-2283. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received., filed by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: #1 docket, #2 notice of docketing, #3 petition for review, #4 petitioner's docketing statement, #5 petitioner's certificate of interest, #6 petitioner's 15(c) statement, #7 Robert Stone's entry of appearance, #8 notice of non-compliance, #9 Margaret Jantzen's entry of appearance, #10 attestation of index of documents of administrative record, #11 index of documents of administrative record, #12 initial decisions dated 7/26/18 and 5/16/19, #13 petitioner's docketing statement, #14 petitioner's entry of appearance, #15 petitioner's certificate of interest, #16 petitioner's 15(c) statement, #17 respondent's docketing statement, #18 petitioner's motion to extend time to file brief, #19 petitioner's certificate of interest, #20 respondent's motion to dismiss or transfer, #21 petitioner's objection to motion to dismiss or transfer, #22 petitioner's certificate of service re: compliance of motion, #23 order on motion to extend time to file brief)(bfa) Modified on 1/22/2020 to correct filing date(bfa). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. On February 25, 2020, I held a telephone conference of counsel. At the conference I set a deadline of March 10, 2020, for Plaintiff's attorney to file his pro hac vice certification and to file a brief on his position and authority for a path going forward. As of today, no filings have been made.Show Cause Response due by 3/30/2020. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnd) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the case should be dismissed for failure to prosecute. On February 25, 2020, I held a telephone conference of counsel. At the conference I set a deadline of March 10, 2020, for Plaintiff's attorney to file his pro hac vice certification and to file a brief on his position and authority for a path going forward. As of today, no filings have been made. Show Cause Response due by 3/26/2020. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Telephone Conference held. Set Deadlines: Pro Hac Vice Certification by Attorney Robert F. Stone due by 3/10/2020. Plaintiff's Brief on authority and path going forward due by 3/10/2020. Response Brief due by 3/24/2020. Reply Brief due by 3/31/2020. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (mnd) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to participate in conference with the court via telephone on February 25, 2020. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to participate in 2/25/2020 telephone conference pending Pro Hac Vice Application by LYNETT S WILSON Responses due by 3/16/2020. (STONE, ROBERT) Modified on 2/24/2020 to clean up text (mnd). (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate as to Attorney ROBERT F. STONE due by 2/10/2020. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (clp) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Attorney Margaret Jantzen to Withdraw as Attorney by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS Responses due by 2/24/2020. (OSBORN, JOHN) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN G. OSBORN on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (OSBORN, JOHN) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process. Attorney MARGARET JANTZEN must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 2/6/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (mnd) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 4:00 PM before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Counsel shall coordinate amongst themselves who can initiate the conference call. Once all participants are on the line, counsel shall call in to 207-221-0028 for the conference. (mnd) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from Attorney ROBERT F. STONE by 2/3/2020. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (mnd) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Margaret Jantzen must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 1/29/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (bfa) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case transferred in from District of US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit; Case Number 19-2283. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received., filed by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: #1 docket, #2 notice of docketing, #3 petition for review, #4 petitioner's docketing statement, #5 petitioner's certificate of interest, #6 petitioner's 15(c) statement, #7 Robert Stone's entry of appearance, #8 notice of non-compliance, #9 Margaret Jantzen's entry of appearance, #10 attestation of index of documents of administrative record, #11 index of documents of administrative record, #12 initial decisions dated 7/26/18 and 5/16/19, #13 petitioner's docketing statement, #14 petitioner's entry of appearance, #15 petitioner's certificate of interest, #16 petitioner's 15(c) statement, #17 respondent's docketing statement, #18 petitioner's motion to extend time to file brief, #19 petitioner's certificate of interest, #20 respondent's motion to dismiss or transfer, #21 petitioner's objection to motion to dismiss or transfer, #22 petitioner's certificate of service re: compliance of motion, #23 order on motion to extend time to file brief)(bfa) Modified on 1/22/2020 to correct filing date(bfa). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less