This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:09:01 (UTC).

WILSON v. DELBALSO et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WILSON filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against DELBALSO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE and NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05723

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE

Presiding Judge

NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEROY A. WILSON

Frackville, PA 17932

Respondents

TERESA DELBALSO

PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION & PAROLE

THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF JOSH SHAPIRO

THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY

KEVIN R. STEEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

ROBERT M. FALIN

Attorney at MONTGOMERY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Pobox 311

Norristown, PA 19404-0311

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) COPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FROM CASE 19-CV-5205 by LEROY A. WILSON. (jaa, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COPY OF ORDER RE: ORDERED THAT THE COURT CONSTRUES THE PETITION AS A CHALLENGE TO HIS BERKS COUNTY CONVICTION WHICH IS SET FORTH AS GROUND 1 IN THE PETITION; THE CLAIM SET FORTH AS GROUND 2 IN THE PETITION, CHALLENGING HIS MONTGOMERY COUNTY CONVICTION IS SEVERED FROM THE PRESENT PETITION; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL OPEN A SEPARATE AND NEW SECTION 2254 PETITION FOR THE CHALLENGE TO THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY CONVICTION LISTED ABOVE, AND SHALL FILE A DUPLICATE OF THE PETITION ON THE NEWLY OPENED DOCKET; BOTH CASES ARE REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF BERKS COUNTY WIT A COPY OF THE PETITION AND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION AND A COPY OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/5/19. 12/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PETITIONER.(jaa, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT BOTH THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY AND THE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL SHAL LFILE ON OR BEFORE 1/25/2020 A RESPONSE TO THE PETITION PURSUANT TO RULE 5 FOL. 28 U.S.C. SEC. 2254, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/9/19. 12/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. FALIN on behalf of TERESA DELBALSO, PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION & PAROLE, KEVIN R. STEEL, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF JOSH SHAPIRO, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY with Certificate of Service(FALIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Letter dated 12/22/19 by LEROY A. WILSON to Clerk, re: Request to Withdraw/Amend Writ of Habeas Corpus From 2254 to 2241. (va, ) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER THAT RESPONDENTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS GRANTED AND THAT THE DEADLINE FOR THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE PETITION IS EXTENDED TO 3/24/20. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 1/24/20.1/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#6

(#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by TERESA DELBALSO, PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION & PAROLE, KEVIN R. STEEL, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF JOSH SHAPIRO, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE.(FALIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER THAT RESPONDENTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IS GRANTED AND THAT THE DEADLINE FOR THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE PETITION IS EXTENDED TO 3/24/20. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 1/24/20.1/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by TERESA DELBALSO, PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION & PAROLE, KEVIN R. STEEL, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF JOSH SHAPIRO, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE.(FALIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter dated 12/22/19 by LEROY A. WILSON to Clerk, re: Request to Withdraw/Amend Writ of Habeas Corpus From 2254 to 2241. (va, ) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER THAT BOTH THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY AND THE OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL SHAL LFILE ON OR BEFORE 1/25/2020 A RESPONSE TO THE PETITION PURSUANT TO RULE 5 FOL. 28 U.S.C. SEC. 2254, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 12/9/19. 12/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. FALIN on behalf of TERESA DELBALSO, PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION & PAROLE, KEVIN R. STEEL, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF JOSH SHAPIRO, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY with Certificate of Service(FALIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FROM CASE 19-CV-5205 by LEROY A. WILSON. (jaa, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COPY OF ORDER RE: ORDERED THAT THE COURT CONSTRUES THE PETITION AS A CHALLENGE TO HIS BERKS COUNTY CONVICTION WHICH IS SET FORTH AS GROUND 1 IN THE PETITION; THE CLAIM SET FORTH AS GROUND 2 IN THE PETITION, CHALLENGING HIS MONTGOMERY COUNTY CONVICTION IS SEVERED FROM THE PRESENT PETITION; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL OPEN A SEPARATE AND NEW SECTION 2254 PETITION FOR THE CHALLENGE TO THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY CONVICTION LISTED ABOVE, AND SHALL FILE A DUPLICATE OF THE PETITION ON THE NEWLY OPENED DOCKET; BOTH CASES ARE REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF BERKS COUNTY WIT A COPY OF THE PETITION AND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION AND A COPY OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/5/19. 12/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PETITIONER.(jaa, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.