This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:58:14 (UTC).

Wilson v. Dart et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Wilson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Dart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08114

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Terrell Wilson

Defendants

Thomas J. Dart

Cook County Medical Staff Division 10

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Keith Terrell Wilson (Exhibits). (Envelope not postmarked) (aee, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aee, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Keith Terrell Wilson for attorney representation. (aee, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 and orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to immediately deduct $47.12 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer of the facility having custody of Plaintiff (electronically if possible) and to the Court's Fiscal Department. However, summonses shall not issue at this time. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim and failure to sign the complaint. Failure to submit a proposed amended complaint that complies with this order by 2/24/2020 will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk will provide Plaintiff with an amended civil rights complaint form, a USM-285 service form, and instructions along with a copy of this order. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If Plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice to renewal if and when Plaintiff files a viable complaint. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/27/2020. Mailed notice(pk, ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Keith Terrell Wilson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits). (aee, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMAILED to Plaintiff an amended civil rights complaint form, a USM-285 service form, and instructions along with a copy of order dated 1/27/2020. (pk, ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAILED order dated 1/27/2020, #5 ) to Supervisor of the Inmate Trust Fund Accounts at Cook County Jail and to the Court's Fiscal Department (pk, ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 and orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to immediately deduct $47.12 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer of the facility having custody of Plaintiff (electronically if possible) and to the Court's Fiscal Department. However, summonses shall not issue at this time. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim and failure to sign the complaint. Failure to submit a proposed amended complaint that complies with this order by 2/24/2020 will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk will provide Plaintiff with an amended civil rights complaint form, a USM-285 service form, and instructions along with a copy of this order. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If Plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice to renewal if and when Plaintiff files a viable complaint. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/27/2020. Mailed notice(pk, ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Keith Terrell Wilson for attorney representation. (aee, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Keith Terrell Wilson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits). (aee, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aee, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Keith Terrell Wilson (Exhibits). (Envelope not postmarked) (aee, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.