This case was last updated from PACER on 10/04/2020 at 08:34:12 (UTC).

Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Wilson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Candy W. Dale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00387

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cindy Marie Wilson

Respondent

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brad D Parkinson

Attorney at PETERSEN PARKINSON and ARNOLD

Po Box 1645

Idaho Falls, ID 83403-1645

Respondent Attorney

Joanne P Rodriguez

Attorney at United States Attorney's office

1290 West Myrtle Street, Suite 500

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rodriguez, Joanne)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cindy Marie Wilson. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Parkinson, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. ((alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Commissioner of Social Security, Cindy Marie Wilson re #1 Petition for Review,. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/27/2020. (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Social Security Number by Cindy Marie Wilson This is a sealed document.. (Parkinson, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REVIEW - (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2084563.), filed by Cindy Marie Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Statement of SSN)(Parkinson, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less