Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2021 at 09:43:55 (UTC).

Wilson v. C I K Beauty Supply Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Wilson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against C I K Beauty Supply Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kayla D McClusky and Elizabeth E Foote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00989

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kayla D McClusky

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth E Foote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Wilson

Defendants

C I K Beauty Supply Inc doing business as Armstrong McCall Professional Beauty Supply

Travelers Indemnity Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gerald Adam Savoie

Attorney at Dudley DeBosier Injury Lawyers (SHV)

4300 Youree Dr Ste 250

Shreveport, LA 71105

Kristen Brazzel Bernard

Attorney at Dudley DeBosier Injury Lawyers (SHV)

4300 Youree Dr Ste 250

Shreveport, LA 71105

Defendant Attorney

Stacey Smith Melerine

Attorney at Travelers Ins Co (MAN)

1 Sanctuary Blvd Ste 202

Mandeville, LA 70471

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/15/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Stacey Smith Melerine on behalf of C I K Beauty Supply Inc, Travelers Indemnity Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/29/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #5

Declaration of Service

1 #4

Exhibit C - List of All Counsel

1 #3

Exhibit B - Stipulation of Damages

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Record

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC, Caddo Parish, Case Number 628919 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4639482) filed by Travelers Indemnity Co, C I K Beauty Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Stipulation of Damages, #4 Exhibit C - List of All Counsel, #5 Declaration of Service)(Attorney Stacey Smith Melerine added to party CIK Beauty Supply Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Stacey Smith Melerine added to party Travelers Indemnity Co(pty:dft))(aty,Melerine, Stacey) Modified docket text on 4/15/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 04/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/15/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Stacey Smith Melerine on behalf of C I K Beauty Supply Inc, Travelers Indemnity Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/29/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. The Travelers Indemnity Company answer due 4/21/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:21-cv-0989 from Alexandria Division to Shreveport Division. New Case Number 5:21-cv-00989. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketJudge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky added. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC, Caddo Parish, Case Number 628919 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4639482) filed by Travelers Indemnity Co, C I K Beauty Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Stipulation of Damages, #4 Exhibit C - List of All Counsel, #5 Declaration of Service)(Attorney Stacey Smith Melerine added to party CIK Beauty Supply Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Stacey Smith Melerine added to party Travelers Indemnity Co(pty:dft))(aty,Melerine, Stacey) Modified docket text on 4/15/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen Brazzel Bernard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerald Adam Savoie