This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2023 at 08:14:51 (UTC).

WILSON v. WALMART, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 WILSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann Marie Donio and Christine P. O'Hearn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00179

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

Presiding Judge

Christine P. O'Hearn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIE WILSON, JR.

Defendants

WALMART, INC.

JOHN/JANE DOE WALMART EMPLOYEE 1-10

JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID R. CASTELLANI

Attorney at CASTELLANI LAW FIRM, LLC

450 Tilton Road, Suite 245

Northfield, NJ 08225

Defendant Attorneys

PATRICK J. MCDONNELL

Attorney at MCDONNELL & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

860 First Avenue, Suite 5B

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

SEAN K. RUCKENSTEIN

Attorney at McDonnell & Associates

860 First Avenue, Suite 58

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART INC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Atlantic County, case number ATL-L-002072-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13956604), filed by WALMART INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit D

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART INC. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#3

(#3) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by WALMART INC. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WALMART INC (MCDONNELL, PATRICK) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#6

(#6) Order Initial Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 10:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/18/2023. (jab) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART, INC.. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#9

(#9) Letter from Sean Ruckenstein regarding Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/15/2023) (amv). (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#10

(#10) Joint Discovery Plan by WALMART, INC..(RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#11

(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2023. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, ECR) (amv) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#12

(#12) ORDER TO PLACE CASE INTO THE ARBITRATION PROGRAM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/21/2023. (amv) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER IN AN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/2/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2023. Pretrial factual Discovery extended to 11/1/2023. The Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in February 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/21/2023. (amv) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER IN AN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/2/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2023. Pretrial factual Discovery extended to 11/1/2023. The Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in February 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/21/2023. (amv) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER TO PLACE CASE INTO THE ARBITRATION PROGRAM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/21/2023. (amv) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2023. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, ECR) (amv) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint Discovery Plan by WALMART, INC..(RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketNOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 1/21/2023 Scheduling Conference. See Order dated 1/18/2023 and Text Order dated 1/25/2023. (sb, ) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Joint Certification of Citizenship #9 filed by SEAN RUCKENSTEIN on 2/13/23 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (amv) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from Sean Ruckenstein regarding Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/15/2023) (amv). (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 2/21/2023 at 10:30 A.M. shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket, or alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/25/2023. (slc) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART, INC.. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Initial Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 10:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/18/2023. (jab) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 1/18/2023. (jab) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 submitted by WALMART, INC. on 1/13/2023 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jab) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information,Caption,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jab) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WALMART INC (MCDONNELL, PATRICK) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by WALMART INC. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketJudge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (mmb, ) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART INC. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART INC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Atlantic County, case number ATL-L-002072-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13956604), filed by WALMART INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less