This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 08:53:02 (UTC).

Wilson et al v. Ronson et al

Case Summary

On September 25, 2021, Ronnie James Wilson, Robin Lynn Wilson, Latina Wilson, and Robena Wilson, (hereinafter “Plaintiffs”), represented by Bill Zuhdi of Zuhdi Law Offices, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Mark Daniel Ronsona, Peter Gene Hernandez, a/k/a Bruno Mars, Sony music entertainment et. al. (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking punitive and exemplary damages, costs, expenses, and pre-judgment interest and other relief for copyright infringement and unlawful use of the song. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Northern District of Oklahoma with Judges Gregory K. Frizzell and Susan E. Huntsman presiding.

 

This is a civil action seeking damages and injunctive relief for copyright infringement arising under 17 U.S.C. §§ 101, et seq. (referred to herein as the “Copyright Act”), and other related causes of action.

 

In the complaint, Plaintiffs alleged that, “Defendants’ copying is blatant and clear in structure, rhythm, type/tone/nature and/or arrangement that the Infringing Work and Original Composition and Defendants have already admitted that Ronnie James Wilson and Robert Lynn Wilson are co-writers of Uptown Funk.” And that, “By continuing to distribute, perform, publish and copy the Infringing Work after the effective date of October 8, 2018, for Ronnie James Wilson and after the effective date of October 9, 2018, for the successors of Robert Lynn Wilson, without authorization of Plaintiffs and payment to Plaintiffs, Defendants have violated Plaintiffs’ copyright in Plaintiffs’ Original Composition for the purpose of their own financial gain.”

 

Plaintiffs also alleged that, “Defendants’ conduct, including infringement, has been, and continues to be, willful and knowing and with utter and reckless disregard for Plaintiffs’ rights, and, as such, Defendants’ direct and willful acts of infringement entitle Plaintiffs to recover from Defendants damages pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 504.”

 

Further, Plaintiffs alleged that, “Under the cause of action as set forth herein, Plaintiffs may recover any and all profits of Defendants that are attributable to their misappropriation and conversion of Plaintiffs’ ideas and property rights. Upon information and belief, Defendants received, and continue to receive, profits from the sale of and contracts related to the Infringing Album and the Infringing Work that violate Plaintiffs’ copyright interests in the Original Composition.”

 

There two claims for relief laid down by Plaintiffs for the alleged copyright infringement and accounting respectively.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiffs have requested the court to pass an order for an award of injunctive relief along with punitive damages pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 504 including all gains, profits, and advantages and accounting of any and all profits. Further, Plaintiffs requested the court for an award of attorneys’ fees and costs pursuant to 17 U.S.C. §§ 101, et seq. and further relief as the court may deem just and proper. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00413

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory K Frizzell

Referral Judge

Susan E Huntsman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ronnie James Wilson

Robin Lynn Wilson

LaTina Wilson

Robena Wilson

Defendants

Nicholaus Williams

Jamareo Artis

Mark Daniel Ronson

Peter Gene Hernandez

Sony Music Entertainment

Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.

RCA Records, Inc.

Atlantic Recording Corporation

Philip Lawrence

Ari Levine

Trinidad James

JAM

Jeff Bhasker

Christopher Gallaspy

Lawrence Mitchell

Way Above Music (BMI)

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bill Zuhdi

Attorney at Zuhdi Law Offices

Po Box 1077

Oklahoma City, OK 73101

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2484102) by LaTina Wilson, Ronnie James Wilson, Robin Lynn Wilson, Robena Wilson (Zuhdi, Bill) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by LaTina Wilson, Robena Wilson, Robin Lynn Wilson, Ronnie James Wilson [Note: Attorney Bill Zuhdi added to party LaTina Wilson(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Zuhdi added to party Robena Wilson(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Zuhdi added to party Robin Lynn Wilson(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Zuhdi added to party Ronnie James Wilson(pty:pla).] (Zuhdi, Bill) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2484102) by LaTina Wilson, Ronnie James Wilson, Robin Lynn Wilson, Robena Wilson (Zuhdi, Bill) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by LaTina Wilson, Robena Wilson, Robin Lynn Wilson, Ronnie James Wilson [Note: Attorney Bill Zuhdi added to party LaTina Wilson(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Zuhdi added to party Robena Wilson(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Zuhdi added to party Robin Lynn Wilson(pty:pla), Attorney Bill Zuhdi added to party Ronnie James Wilson(pty:pla).] (Zuhdi, Bill) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.A.M is a litigant

Latest cases where Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ATLANTIC RECORDING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant