This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 07:46:46 (UTC).

Wilson, et al v. Jones, et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 Wilson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jones. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Maloney and Maarten Vermaat. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00257

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judge

Maarten Vermaat

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ginger Wilson

Brandi Wilson

James Wilson

Defendants

David Allen Jones

PML Trucking, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vincent R. Petrucelli

Attorney at Petrucelli & Waara, P.C.

328 W Genesee St., P.O. Box Aa

Iron River, MI 49935

Defendant Attorney

Timothy S. Groustra

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcote, P.C.

89 Kercheval Ave., Ste. 200

Grosse Pointe Farms, MI 48236

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/20/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 2/18/2020 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PML Trucking, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) NOTICE regarding reassignment of case from Southern Division (1:19-cv-1058) to Northern Division per Administrative Order 11-035; all future fillings should reflect the NEW CASE NUMBER of (2:19-cv-257) (ndj) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (slk). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. re Exhibit #3 , Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal) #2 , Notice of Removal #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (slk) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Gogebic County Circuit Court case number 19-231-NI filed by David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 2/20/2020; telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; (cam) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. re Exhibit #3 , Notice of Removal #1 (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #1

Index Exhibits

#3

(#3) Amended EXHIBIT re #1 by defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Amended) to Notice of Removal) (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit B (Amended) to Notice of Removal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 2/20/2020; telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; (cam) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/20/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 2/18/2020 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. re Exhibit #3 , Notice of Removal #1 (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. re Exhibit #3 , Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal) #2 , Notice of Removal #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (slk) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4712181 (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE regarding reassignment of case from Southern Division (1:19-cv-1058) to Northern Division per Administrative Order 11-035; all future fillings should reflect the NEW CASE NUMBER of (2:19-cv-257) (ndj) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (slk). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PML Trucking, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Amended EXHIBIT re #1 by defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Amended) to Notice of Removal) (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy S. Groustra on behalf of defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Gogebic County Circuit Court case number 19-231-NI filed by David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Groustra, Timothy) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.