This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2022 at 07:34:40 (UTC).

Wilson et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 Wilson filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-82537

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donald Wilson

Graciela Wilson

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

Pfizer Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC

Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.

Chattem, Inc.

CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Walgreen Co.

Duane Reade, Inc.

Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

Rite Aid Corporation

Osco Drug, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ilana S. Wolk

Attorney at The Jacob D. Fuchsberg Law Firm

3 Park Avenue, Suite 3700

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mee) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#3

(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • Docket(#5) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82537-RLR Wilson et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mee) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15271845, filed by Graciela Wilson, Donald Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Wolk, Ilana) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Duane Reade, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RITE AID CORP. is a litigant