This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2019 at 08:04:25 (UTC).

Wilson-Davis & Co. v. US Securities and Exchange Commission

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 Wilson-Davis Co filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against US Securities and Exchange Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00839

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilson-Davis & Co.

Defendant

US Securities and Exchange Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard F. Ensor

Attorney at MICHAEL BEST & FRIEDRICH LLP

2750 E Cottonwood Pkwy Ste 560

Cottonwood Heights, UT 84121

Anne Taylor Freeland

Attorney at MICHAEL BEST & FRIEDRICH LLP

2750 E Cottonwood Pkwy Ste 560

Cottonwood Heights, UT 84121

Defendant Attorney

Mark Robert Tallarico

Attorney at SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION

100 F St Ne

Washington, DC 20549

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/19/2020. Motions due by 3/31/2020. Status Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/6/2019. (las) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#11

(#11) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Freeland, Anne) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#10

(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by US Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

9 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

9 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wilson-Davis & Co. Summons and Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Ensor, Richard) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Robert Tallarico on behalf of US Securities and Exchange Commission (Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/1/2019. (las) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

2 #15

Exhibit Exhibit 14

2 #14

Exhibit Exhibit 13

2 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 6

2 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3

2 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/19/2020. Motions due by 3/31/2020. Status Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/6/2019. (las) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Freeland, Anne) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by US Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wilson-Davis & Co. Summons and Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Ensor, Richard) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Robert Tallarico on behalf of US Securities and Exchange Commission (Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilson-Davis & Co.. US Securities and Exchange Commission served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Ensor, Richard) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/1/2019. (las) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Securities and Exchange Commission. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Attorney's Office District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • (#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/30/2019. (las) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against US Securities and Exchange Commission (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3406271) filed by Wilson-Davis & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Ensor, Richard) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Plaintiff Wilson-Davis & Co. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less