This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2021 at 08:51:54 (UTC).

In re: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 In re Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01069

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Appellant

Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Appellee

Delaware Trust Company, in its capacity as Lien-Related Litigation Creditor Representative

In Re

Sanchez Energy Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

James W Walker

Attorney at Cole Schotz, PC

901 Main St, Suite 4120

Dallas, TX 75202

Jeffrey A. Fuisz

Attorney at Arnold Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Jonathan I Levine

Attorney at Arnold Porter et al

250 West 55Th St

New York, NY 10019-9710

Ginger Erin Clements

Attorney at Arnold & Porter et al

70 West Madison St, Ste 4200

Chicago, IL 60602

Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin I. Finestone

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel et al

51 Madison Ave, 22Nd Fl

New York, NY 10010

William B Adams

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

51 Madison Ave. 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Patricia Baron Tomasco

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

711 Louisiana St., Suite 500

Houston, TX 77002

K. John Shaffer

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel

865 S. Figueroa St., 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

In Re Attorney

John P Melko

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77002-2099

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER entered: The parties have moved to stay two bankruptcy appeals, Civil Action Nos. 21-1069 and 21-1071, pending mediation. (Docket Entry No. 15). The court grants the motion. These cases are administratively closed pending mediation. Any party may move to reinstate the cases to the active docket within 7 days of the conclusion of the mediation. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Appeals Pending Mediation by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/9/2021. (Walker, James) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Docketing an Appeal under Bankruptcy Rule 8018. On 5/11/2021, the appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court, assigned Judge Lee H Rosenthal, Civil Action 4:21-cv-1069. All appellate filings must now be made in the United States District Court with the civil action caption and case number. Parties notified, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. The attached documents represent all designated items to be included as the Record on Appeal in this matter, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation, #4 Continuation, #5 Continuation, #6 Continuation, #7 Continuation, #8 Continuation, #9 Continuation, #10 Continuation, #11 Record from Adversary Case 20-3057)(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2021: #12 Sealed Documents) (ShoshanaArnow, 4). (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #8 Motion for William B. Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #7 Motion for K. John Shaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Benjamin I. Finestone to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DESIGNATION of Patricia B. Tomasco as attorney in charge of Delaware Trust Company, in its capacity as Lien-Related Litigation Creditor Representative, filed.(Tomasco, Patricia) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for William B. Adams to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delaware Trust Company, in its capacity as Lien-Related Litigation Creditor Representative, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/12/2021. (Tomasco, Patricia) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for K. John Shaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delaware Trust Company, in its capacity as Lien-Related Litigation Creditor Representative, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/12/2021. (Tomasco, Patricia) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Benjamin I. Finestone to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delaware Trust Company, in its capacity as Lien-Related Litigation Creditor Representative, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/12/2021. (Tomasco, Patricia) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. Judge Kenneth M Hoyt no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Kenneth M Hoyt recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKETED IN ERROR - CLERKS NOTICE of Appeal Deficiency. Parties notified., filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corrected Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On March 24, 2021, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Kenneth M Hoyt, Civil Action 4:21cv1069. Parties notified. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(ltien, 4) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On March 24, 2021, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Nancy F Atlas, Civil Action 4:21-cv-1069. Parties notified. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (ltien, 4) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delaware Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanchez Energy Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth John Shaffer