This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 09:26:36 (UTC).

Wills v. Encompass Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Wills filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Encompass Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. K. Holmes III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02150

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul I. Wills

Defendants

Encompass Insurance Company

Allstate Insurance Company

Encompass Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

E. C. Gilbreath

Attorney at Gilbreath Law Firm

P.O. Box 5560

Fort Smith, AR 72913

Defendant Attorneys

James D. Burns

Attorney at Laser Law Firm P.A.

101 S. Spring Street, Suite 300

Little Rock, AR 72201

Zachary Richmond Hill

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.

400 W. Capitol Ave Ste. 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

Richard Shane Strabala

Attorney at Huckabay, Munson, Rowlett & Moore

1900 Regions Center, 400 West Capitol

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Vacate filed by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company. (Burns, James) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#28

(#28) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #13 MOTION to Vacate filed by Paul I. Wills. (Gilbreath, E.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#27

(#27) ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCUMENT #28 ***RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #13 MOTION to Vacate filed by Paul I. Wills. (Gilbreath, E.) Modified on 10/7/2020 to add text (lw). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#26

(#26) MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal of Second Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company. (Hill, Zachary) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#25

(#25) MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal of Second Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company. (Hill, Zachary) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

13 #3

Affidavit Dr. Arkin

13 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's MSJ

13 #1

Exhibit Order Granting PL MSJ

#13

(#27) ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCUMENT #28 ***RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #13 MOTION to Vacate filed by Paul I. Wills. (Gilbreath, E.) Modified on 10/7/2020 to add text (lw). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

2 #57

Exhibit EEE: Court's Email Regarding Scheduling Conference

2 #51

Exhibit YY: Motion to Correct Records

2 #50

Exhibit XX: Letter to Court from Atty James Burns Re MSJ

2 #49

Exhibit WW: Courts Letter to Atty Burns

2 #48

Exhibit VV: Motion for Order to Fix Date

2 #45

Exhibit SS: Transcript Filed by Court Reporter Paula Barden (3 Vols)

2 #44

Exhibit RR: Amended Notice of Appeal

2 #20

Exhibit T: Motion for Specific Dates

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Allstate Insurance Company. (mjm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) TEXT ONLY ORDER extending deadline to respond to #25 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Second Amended Complaint to November 3, 2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 13, 2020. (rab) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Vacate filed by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company. (Burns, James) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #13 MOTION to Vacate filed by Paul I. Wills. (Gilbreath, E.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCUMENT #28 ***RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #13 MOTION to Vacate filed by Paul I. Wills. (Gilbreath, E.) Modified on 10/7/2020 to add text (lw). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal of Second Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company. (Hill, Zachary) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Dismiss for Partial Dismissal of Second Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company. (Hill, Zachary) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint, by Allstate Insurance Company.(Hill, Zachary) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on the basis of the filing of a #21 second amended complaint. See In re Atlas Van Lines, Inc., 209 F.3d 1064, 1067 (8th Cir. 2000) ("It is well-established that an amended complaint supercedes an original complaint and renders the original complaint without legal effect."). To the extent that arguments for dismissal raised in the mooted motion to dismiss may apply to the currently-operative complaint, they are not waived and may be raised again if appropriate. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 30, 2020. (rab) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company.(Burns, James) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #4 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint, against All Defendants , filed by Paul I. Wills. Related document: #4 Complaint, filed by Paul I. Wills, #6 Amended Complaint, filed by Paul I. Wills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gilbreath, E.) Modified on 9/25/2020 (hnc). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2206830.. (Hill, Zachary) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Sebastian County on 08/06/2020 in case CV-19-131)(mjm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #4 Complaint against Encompass Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, filed by Paul I. Wills. Related document: #4 Complaint filed by Paul I. Willis. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Sebastian County on 07/21/2020 in case CV-19-131)(mjm) Modified on 8/24/2020 to edit Plaintiff last name (mjm). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Sebastian County on 02/22/2019 in case CV-19-131) (mjm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company, filed by Paul I. Wills. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Sebastian County on 02/12/2019 in case CV-19-131)(mjm) Modified on 8/24/2020 to edit Plaintiff last name (mjm). (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (mjm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/26/2020. (mjm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Sebastian County, case number CV-19-131., filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Summons - Encompass, #3 Exhibit C: Answer of Defendants, #4 Exhibit D: Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E: Response to D's Motion to Strike, #6 Exhibit F: MSJ and BIS, #7 Exhibit G: Motion to Seal Medical Records, #8 Exhibit H: Order Sealing Medical Records, #9 Exhibit I: D's MSJ and BIS, #10 Exhibit J: Resp to P's MPSJ and BIS, #11 Exhibit K: P's Resp to D's MPSJ, #12 Exhibit L: Motion for Judgment for P on P's MSJ, #13 Exhibit M: D's Reply to P's Resp to D's MPSJ, #14 Exhibit N: Court's Letter to Counsel Setting Hrg, #15 Exhibit O: Order Granting P's MSJ, #16 Exhibit P: Court's Letter to Counsel Forwarding Order, #17 Exhibit Q: (Set Aside 8-16-19) Order-D's MPSJ, #18 Exhibit R: Motion to Reconsider and BIS, #19 Exhibit S: Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment, #20 Exhibit T: Motion for Specific Dates, #21 Exhibit U: Order-Response to Motion to Reconsider BIS, #22 Exhibit V: Amended Order-Pltf's Motion for Specific Dates Requesting, #23 Exhibit W: P's Resp to D's Motion to Reconsider BIS, #24 Exhibit X: Motion to Set Specific Date, #25 Exhibit Y: Order-P's Motion to Set Specific Date, #26 Exhibit Z: Notice of Appeal, #27 Exhibit AA: Court's Letter to Counsel Setting Hrg, #28 Exhibit BB: Motion for Relief from Judgment, #29 Exhibit CC: Response to Pltf's Motion to Reconsider, #30 Exhibit DD: Motion to Set Specific Date, #31 Exhibit EE: Notice of Appeal Filed by Atty James Burns, #32 Exhibit FF: Order-Pltf's Motion to Set the Specific Date, #33 Exhibit GG: Order Overruling Def's Motion to Reconsider, #34 Exhibit HH: Motion for Damages Atty Fees on Loss, #35 Exhibit II: Exhibit A B-Attachment to BIS, #36 Exhibit JJ: BIS of Pltf's Motion for Damages Atty Fees, #37 Exhibit KK: Reply to Def's Resp to Pltf's Motion to Reconsider, #38 Exhibit LL: Order-Def's MPSJ, #39 Exhibit MM: D's Resp to Pltf's Motion for Attorney Fees, #40 Exhibit NN: Order to Fix Date, #41 Exhibit OO: Motion for Order to Fix Date, #42 Exhibit PP: Reply to D's Resp to Pltf's Mtn for Atty Fees, #43 Exhibit QQ: Order-Pltf is Awarded an Atty Fee, #44 Exhibit RR: Amended Notice of Appeal, #45 Exhibit SS: Transcript Filed by Court Reporter Paula Barden (3 Vols), #46 Exhibit TT: Motion for Relief from Judgment Decree or Order, #47 Exhibit UU: Order-Pltf's Motion to Fix the Date, #48 Exhibit VV: Motion for Order to Fix Date, #49 Exhibit WW: Courts Letter to Atty Burns, #50 Exhibit XX: Letter to Court from Atty James Burns Re MSJ, #51 Exhibit YY: Motion to Correct Records, #52 Exhibit ZZ: Order to Correct Records, #53 Exhibit AAA: From Ark Cout of Appeals, #54 Exhibit BBB: Opinion from Ark Court of Appeals, #55 Exhibit CCC: Letter to Clerk from Encompass Regarding Claim, #56 Exhibit DDD: Summons Issued to Allstate, #57 Exhibit EEE: Court's Email Regarding Scheduling Conference, #58 Exhibit FFF: Summons Issued to Encompass, #59 Exhibit GGG: Amended Complaint, #60 Exhibit HHH: Summons Issued to Encompass Ins Co., #61 Exhibit III: Pre-Trial Scheduling Order, #62 Exhibit JJJ: Answer of Encompass Ins Co and Encompass Indemnity, #63 Exhibit KKK: Affidavit of Service, #64 Exhibit LLL: Answer of DS Encompass, #65 Exhibit MMM: Order of 8-16-19 is Set Aside, #66 Exhibit NNN: P's Resp to Motion of Encompass, #67 Exhibit OOO: Motion for Compel Discovery, #68 Exhibit PPP: MTC Resp to RFP, #69 Exhibit QQQ: MTC Production of Documents, #70 Exhibit RRR: MTC to Int.)(mjm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Allstate Insurance Company. (mjm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James D. Burns