This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 07:11:57 (UTC).

Cozette Willner v. Bank of America Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Cozette Willner filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01430

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cozette Willner

Defendants

Bank of America Corporation

DOES 1-100, inclusive

Early Warning Services, LLC doing business as Zellepay.com

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan S Esensten

Brian D Chase

Ian M. Silvers

Robert L. Esensten

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew D. Benedetto

David W Moon

Julia B Strickland

Christopher R Fredrich

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Cozette Willner. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Esensten, Jordan) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#12

(#12) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:22-cv-00763 DOC(ADSx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01430 DOC(ADSx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#10

(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Early Warning Services, LLC DBA Zellepay.com, (Fredrich, Christopher) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

14 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Cozette Willner. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Esensten, Jordan) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:22-cv-00763 DOC(ADSx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01430 DOC(ADSx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Early Warning Services, LLC DBA Zellepay.com, (Fredrich, Christopher) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Early Warning Services, LLC DBA Zellepay.com.(Attorney Christopher R Fredrich added to party Early Warning Services, LLC DBA Zellepay.com(pty:dft))(Fredrich, Christopher) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Cozette Willner, upon Defendant Early Warning Services, LLC served on 1/25/2023, answer due 2/15/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alex Gonzalez, Authorized Agent to accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/27/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Does, Early Warning Services, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Cozette Willner. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/24/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 served on February 24, 2023. (Benedetto, Matthew) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation. Related Case(s): 8:22-cv-01183-DOC-ADS(consolidated with Case No. 2:22- cv-02313-DOC-ADS), and 8:23-cv-00140-DOC-ADS (Benedetto, Matthew) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation identifying Berkshire Hathaway Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Benedetto, Matthew) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation. (Benedetto, Matthew) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV01554 Receipt No: ACACDC-34855165 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Declaration of Shane Daniels in Support) (Attorney Matthew D. Benedetto added to party Bank of America Corporation(pty:dft))(Benedetto, Matthew) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less