This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 12:01:08 (UTC).

WILLIS v. BOTE LLC

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 WILLIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BOTE LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00528

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

ROBERT WILLIS

Defendant and Counter Claimant

BOTE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

MARIE A MATTOX

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

THOMAS L DICKENS, III

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

JOSEPH DAVID SIBLEY, IV

Attorney at CAMARA & SIBLEY LLP - HOUSTON TX

4400 Post Oak Parkway, Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

LACEY DELORI CORONA

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS BROAD & CASSEL - TALLAHASSEE FL

215 S Monroe Street, Suite 400

Tallahassee, FL 32302

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #11 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/16/2019. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Mediation to take place by 12/16/2019. Mediation Report due by 12/30/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/2/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (CORONA, LACEY) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by ROBERT WILLIS. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BOTE LLC identifying Corporate Parent BOTE HOLDINGS, LLC for BOTE LLC, BOTE LLC.. (CORONA, LACEY) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOSEPH D. SIBLEY IV. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/28/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit Cert of Good Standing

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4501864.) by ROBERT WILLIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing) (SIBLEY, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#6

(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/29/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/15/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit Ex. A to BOTE Counterclaim

#5

(#5) BOTE, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint BOTE, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against ROBERT WILLIS by BOTE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to BOTE Counterclaim) (CORONA, LACEY) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by LACEY DELORI CORONA on behalf of BOTE LLC (CORONA, LACEY) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BOTE LLC. (sdw) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

1 #1

Summons to be issued by clerk

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BOTE LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4444246.), filed by ROBERT WILLIS. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #11 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 12/16/2019. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Mediation to take place by 12/16/2019. Mediation Report due by 12/30/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/2/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (CORONA, LACEY) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by ROBERT WILLIS. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BOTE LLC identifying Corporate Parent BOTE HOLDINGS, LLC for BOTE LLC, BOTE LLC.. (CORONA, LACEY) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOSEPH D. SIBLEY IV. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/28/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Sibley. (sdw) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4501864.) by ROBERT WILLIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing) (SIBLEY, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/29/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/15/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) BOTE, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint BOTE, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against ROBERT WILLIS by BOTE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to BOTE Counterclaim) (CORONA, LACEY) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by LACEY DELORI CORONA on behalf of BOTE LLC (CORONA, LACEY) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to BOTE LLC. (sdw) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BOTE LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4444246.), filed by ROBERT WILLIS. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less