This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2022 at 08:22:35 (UTC).

Willis et al v. National Interstate Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 Willis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against National Interstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03819

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Damika Willis

Tavius Johnson

Defendants

National Interstate Insurance Company

Suit, LLC

Tyrone Wallace

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Joseph Kingsley

Attorney at Fried Goldberg LLC

Three Alliance Center, 3550 Lenox Road

Atlanta, GA 30326-4302

Eric Jonathan David Rogers

Attorney at Fried Goldberg LLC

Three Alliance Center, 3550 Lenox Road

Atlanta, GA 30326-4302

Michael L. Goldberg

Attorney at Fried Goldberg LLC

Three Alliance Center, 3550 Lenox Road

Atlanta, GA 30326-4302

Defendant Attorneys

James E. Gilson

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.

Suite 2900, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Mark Daniel Christopher

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.-ATL

Suite 2900, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

Scott Harlan Moulton

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.-ATL

Suite 2900, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) RESPONSE in Support re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tavius Johnson, Damika Willis, Damika Willis. (Kingsley, Daniel) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#20

(#20) REPLY BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by National Interstate Insurance Company, Suit, LLC, Tyrone Wallace. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Regarding Discovery by Tavius Johnson, Damika Willis(individually and as a parent of Jaylen Johnson, deceased ), Damika Willis.(Kingsley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Def's Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Suit, LLC.(Gilson, James) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#17

(#17) Initial Disclosures by National Interstate Insurance Company, Suit, LLC, Tyrone Wallace.(Gilson, James) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#16

(#16) Initial Disclosures by Tavius Johnson, Damika Willis(individually and as a parent of Jaylen Johnson, deceased ), Damika Willis.(Kingsley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

15 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Jurisdictional Objection

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Tavius Johnson, Damika Willis, Damika Willis. (Kingsley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Interstate Insurance Company, Suit, LLC, Tyrone Wallace.(Christopher, Mark) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by National Interstate Insurance Company.(Christopher, Mark) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Suit, LLC.(Christopher, Mark) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Tyrone Wallace. Discovery ends on 2/21/2023.(Christopher, Mark) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/22/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C- Notice of Removal - State

1 #2

Exhibit B- Declaration of Tyrone Wallace, Jr.

1 #1

Exhibit A- State Pleadings

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE in Support re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tavius Johnson, Damika Willis, Damika Willis. (Kingsley, Daniel) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (slc) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by National Interstate Insurance Company, Suit, LLC, Tyrone Wallace. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Regarding Discovery by Tavius Johnson, Damika Willis(individually and as a parent of Jaylen Johnson, deceased ), Damika Willis.(Kingsley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Def's Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Suit, LLC.(Gilson, James) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Initial Disclosures by National Interstate Insurance Company, Suit, LLC, Tyrone Wallace.(Gilson, James) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Initial Disclosures by Tavius Johnson, Damika Willis(individually and as a parent of Jaylen Johnson, deceased ), Damika Willis.(Kingsley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by National Interstate Insurance Company, Suit, LLC, Tyrone Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Jurisdictional Objection)(Christopher, Mark) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Tavius Johnson, Damika Willis, Damika Willis. (Kingsley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Suit, LLC. (Gilson, James) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Kingsley, Daniel) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Compliance by Scott H. Moulton (Gilson, James) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order by Mark D. Christopher (Gilson, James) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order by James E. Gilson (Gilson, James) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on September 23, 2022. (ash) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Interstate Insurance Company, Suit, LLC, Tyrone Wallace.(Christopher, Mark) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by National Interstate Insurance Company.(Christopher, Mark) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Suit, LLC.(Christopher, Mark) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Tyrone Wallace. Discovery ends on 2/21/2023.(Christopher, Mark) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Tyrone Wallace, Suit, LLC, National Interstate Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12084406) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B- Declaration of Tyrone Wallace, Jr., #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Removal - State, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(gas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Interstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARK D CHRISTOPHER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Moulton