This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:54:02 (UTC).

Williamson v. Wills et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Williamson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wills. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is B. Lynn Winmill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00099

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

B. Lynn Winmill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shaylee Williamson

Defendants

Marcus Graham

Paul Olsen

Eric Dayley

Paul Gilbert

Brady Barnes

Tom Sellers

Lee Edgley

Kedrick Wills

Ralph Powell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stratton Paul Laggis

Attorney at Reichert Laggis, PLLC

420 South 4Th Avenue

Pocatello, ID 83201

John Joseph Bulger

Attorney at HEARN LAW, PLC

155 S. 2Nd Ave

Pocatello, ID 83201

Richard A Hearn

Attorney at HEARN LAW, PLC

P.O. Box 70

Pocatello, ID 83204

Shane T Reichert

Attorney at Reichert Laggis, PLLC

420 South 4Th Avenue

Pocatello, ID 83204

Defendant Attorney

Michael J Kane

Attorney at Michael Kane & Associates, PLLC

P. O. Box 2865, 4355 West Emerald, Suite 190

Boise, ID 83706

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 7/26/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 11:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

16 #1

Memorandum in Support

#16

(#16) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (as to State of Idaho and Idaho State Police) Michael J Kane appearing for Defendants Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Kane, Michael)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Brady Barnes served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Eric Dayley served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Lee Edgley served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Paul Gilbert served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Marcus Graham served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Paul Olsen served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Ralph Powell served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Tom Sellers served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Hearn, Richard)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Ralph Powell served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Hearn, Richard)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Brady Barnes served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Hearn, Richard)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Lee Edgley served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; Marcus Graham served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; Paul Olsen served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; Tom Sellers served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Hearn, Richard)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Eric Dayley served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; Paul Gilbert served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; Ralph Powell served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hearn, Richard)

1 #5

Summons

1 #6

Summons

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers.(Kane, Michael)

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Affidavit of Indigency

1 #3

Cover Sheet

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers, Shaylee Williamson re #9 Answer to Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/23/2019. (jp)

1 #4

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Motion to Waive Bond against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1865727.), filed by Shaylee Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency, #2 Complaint, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Hearn, Richard)

1 #11

Summons

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 7/26/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 11:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (as to State of Idaho and Idaho State Police) Michael J Kane appearing for Defendants Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Kane, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Brady Barnes served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Eric Dayley served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Lee Edgley served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Paul Gilbert served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Marcus Graham served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Paul Olsen served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Ralph Powell served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019; Tom Sellers served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Hearn, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Ralph Powell served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Hearn, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Brady Barnes served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Hearn, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Lee Edgley served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; Marcus Graham served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; Paul Olsen served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019; Tom Sellers served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Hearn, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaylee Williamson. Eric Dayley served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; Paul Gilbert served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; Ralph Powell served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hearn, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers, Shaylee Williamson re #9 Answer to Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/23/2019. (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers.(Kane, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Ralph Powell, Tom Sellers. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT 1st Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Shaylee Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Barnes, #2 Summons Dayley, #3 Summons Edgley, #4 Summons Gilbert, #5 Summons Graham, #6 Summons Olsen, #7 Summons Powell, #8 Summons Sellers)(Hearn, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Brady Barnes, Eric Dayley, Lee Edgley, Paul Gilbert, Marcus Graham, Paul Olsen, Tom Sellers, Kedrick Wills. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #2 Motion to Waive. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE the Court has instructed Court staff not to discuss this case with Mr. Sellers, or with any other CSO. When all parties have appeared in this case, the Court will schedule a conference to discuss this issue. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BOND in the amount of $ $1,000 posted by Shaylee Williamson (receipt number IDX400000766)(jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please disregard docket number #1 as the wrong event was used. The document will be re-filed by the Clerk using the correct event of Motion to Waive. (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Waive Bond Pursuant to Idaho Code 6-610(2)John Joseph Bulger appearing for Plaintiff Shaylee Williamson. Responses due by 4/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency, #2 Complaint, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(jp) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Motion to Waive Bond against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1865727.), filed by Shaylee Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency, #2 Complaint, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Hearn, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.