This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:23:24 (UTC).

Williamson v. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by Williamson against Ford Motor Company in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00661

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Lajuana M. Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Williamson

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Exhibit MCHR Notice of Right to Sue

10 #1

Exhibit Charge of Discrimination

#15

(#15) Defendant Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint for Damages on behalf of Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Ford Motor Company filed by Megan Lowe Stiles on behalf of Brian Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit MCHR Notice of Right to Sue)(Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#13

(#13) Joint MOTION for protective order (Entry of Joint Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 motion for protective order. Signed on 10/2/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Megan Lowe Stiles on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Williamson.(Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2020 02:00 PM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 10/27/2020 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 9/26/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Brian Williamson. (Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company of First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and First Request for Production to Plaintiff filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#5

(#5) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 10/15/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/30/2019. Signed on August 28, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS by Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#3

(#3) Defendant Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Defendant Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint for Damages on behalf of Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 motion for protective order. Signed on 10/2/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint MOTION for protective order (Entry of Joint Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Megan Lowe Stiles on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Williamson.(Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Ford Motor Company filed by Megan Lowe Stiles on behalf of Brian Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit MCHR Notice of Right to Sue)(Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2020 02:00 PM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 10/27/2020 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 9/26/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Brian Williamson. (Stiles, Megan) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company of First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff; and First Request for Production to Plaintiff filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Greg Kays. Please note the new case number: 19-661-CV-W-DGK. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 10/15/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/30/2019. Signed on August 28, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS by Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Defendant Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to both Plaintiff's and Defendant's attorneys. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 9/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County, Missouri County, case number 19CY-CV07021, filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6457278. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Millman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.