This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:44:08 (UTC).

Williamson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Williamson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian A Tsuchida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00747

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian A Tsuchida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deborah Williamson

Deborah L Williamson

Defendants

Nancy A. Berryhill

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maren A. Bam

Attorney at SALUS LAW PLLC

8513 W 9Th Ave

Kennewick, WA 99336

Maren A Bam

Attorney at SALUS LAW PLLC

8513 W 9Th Ave

Kennewick, WA 99336

Defendant Attorneys

Kerry Jane Keefe

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

700 Stewart St, Ste 5220

Seattle, WA 98101-1271

Heather L Griffith

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

701 5Th Avenue Ste 2900

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Heather L Griffith on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Griffith, Heather) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Deborah L Williamson re #1 Complaint (Bam, Maren) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#2) CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (AE) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Nancy A. Berryhill (Receipt # 0981-5771984), filed by Deborah Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Bam, Maren) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.