This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 08:04:40 (UTC).

Williams v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Williams filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Williams

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant

Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M. Randy Rice

Attorney at Rice & Associates, P.A.

124 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1850

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant Attorneys

Teaven Stamatis

Attorney at Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C.

124 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1560

Little Rock, AR 72201

Mark D. Cronenwett

Attorney at Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C.

14160 Dallas Parkway, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, filed by Kenneth Williams.(kdr) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

No Description Available

3 #3

Main Document - Incorrect (see below)

3 #1

Main Document - Correct

#4

(#4) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal and #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (cmn) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Cronenwett on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER directing that, before the sale may proceed, the parties must seek further orders from the Court regarding the sale. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/31/2022. (jbh) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER directing that, before the sale may proceed, the parties must seek further orders from the Court regarding the sale. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/31/2022. (jbh) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Cronenwett on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Cronenwett, Mark) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal and #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (cmn) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (cmn). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, filed by Kenneth Williams.(kdr) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-21-8143. Fee of $402. Receipt Number LIT085200. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2022: #2 Notice of Removal w/ original signature) (cmn). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Teaven James Stamatis