This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2020 at 08:59:05 (UTC).

Williams v. US Bank NA

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Williams filed an Other lawsuit against US Bank NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark Waddoups and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Clark Waddoups

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cameron Williams

Defendant

US Bank NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brett D. Cragun

Attorney at CRAGUN & CRAGUN

Po Box 160234

Clearfield, UT 84016

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant US Bank NA. (Zender, Jill) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint filed by US Bank NA.(Zender, Jill) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Motions due by 1/29/2021. Scheduling/Status Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 02:45 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Clark Waddoups. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/11/20. (jrj) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cragun, Brett) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#8

(#8) CLERKS ORDER Granting #7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. It is ordered that Defendant U.S.Bank shall have up to and including March 13, 2020 to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Anne W. Morgan. (kpf) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant US Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney Jill A Zender added to party US Bank NA(pty:dft)(Zender, Jill) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/30/20. (jmr) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against US Bank NA (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3470429) filed by Cameron Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Cragun, Brett) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff Cameron Williams is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant US Bank NA. (Zender, Jill) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint filed by US Bank NA.(Zender, Jill) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Motions due by 1/29/2021. Scheduling/Status Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 02:45 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Clark Waddoups. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/11/20. (jrj) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cragun, Brett) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for US Bank NA answer due 3/13/2020. (kpf) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERKS ORDER Granting #7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. It is ordered that Defendant U.S.Bank shall have up to and including March 13, 2020 to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Anne W. Morgan. (kpf) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant US Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney Jill A Zender added to party US Bank NA(pty:dft)(Zender, Jill) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cameron Williams as to US Bank NA served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Cragun, Brett) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/30/20. (jmr) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A). Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 01/29/2020. (tdp) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Bank NA. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against US Bank NA (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3470429) filed by Cameron Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Cragun, Brett) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff Cameron Williams is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett D Cragun