This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2019 at 07:15:06 (UTC).

Williams, Scott & Associates LLC et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Williams, Scott Associates LLC filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen McMahon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08736

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John T. Williams

Jonesboro, GA 30238

WSA, LLC

437 Kendrick Est Dr.

Jonesboro, GA 30238

Williams, Scott & Associates LLC

437 Kendrick Est Dr.

Jonesboro, GA 30238

Defendant

United States of America

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is directed to show cause why his FTCA claim should not be dismissed as untimely. Plaintiff must submit a declaration to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within thirty days of the date of this order, and label the document with docket number 19-CV-8736 (CM). No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/12/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/28/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#5

(#5) LETTER from John T. Williams, dated 10/17/19 re: Plaintiff writes to the Court that, as he writes this letter, his case has not had a judge assigned to it; and that he would like to know why. Document filed by John T. Williams.(sc) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#3

(#3) LETTER from John T. Williams dated 9/14/2019 re: I was told I was barred under the "three strikes" provision of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, 28 U.S.C. 1915 (g), from filing any federal civil action forma pauperis while a prisoner unless I'm in imminent danger. Document filed by John T. Williams.(rdz) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against United States of America. Document filed by John T. Williams, Williams, Scott & Associates LLC, WSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rdz) Modified on 10/7/2019 (sac). (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by John T. Williams.(rdz) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #6 Order 30 Days Other (case opening), to John T. Williams 437 Kendrick Est Dr. Jonesboro, GA 30238; Williams, Scott & Associates LLC 437 Kendrick Est Dr. Jonesboro, GA 30238; WSA, LLC 437 Kendrick Est Dr. Jonesboro, GA 30238. (vba) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is directed to show cause why his FTCA claim should not be dismissed as untimely. Plaintiff must submit a declaration to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within thirty days of the date of this order, and label the document with docket number 19-CV-8736 (CM). No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/12/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application to WSA, LLC 437 Kendrick Est Dr. Jonesboro, GA 30238; Williams, Scott & Associates LLC 437 Kendrick Est Dr. Jonesboro, GA 30238; John T. Williams 437 Kendrick Est Dr. Jonesboro, GA 30238. (vba) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/28/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER from John T. Williams, dated 10/17/19 re: Plaintiff writes to the Court that, as he writes this letter, his case has not had a judge assigned to it; and that he would like to know why. Document filed by John T. Williams.(sc) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from John T. Williams dated 9/14/2019 re: I was told I was barred under the "three strikes" provision of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, 28 U.S.C. 1915 (g), from filing any federal civil action forma pauperis while a prisoner unless I'm in imminent danger. Document filed by John T. Williams.(rdz) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against United States of America. Document filed by John T. Williams, Williams, Scott & Associates LLC, WSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rdz) Modified on 10/7/2019 (sac). (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by John T. Williams.(rdz) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Williams, Scott & Associates LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ENCLOS CORP is a litigant