This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:20:48 (UTC).

Williams v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Williams against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11805

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Judith G. Dein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Williams

Defendant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Declaration

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (PSSA, 5) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by Anthony Williams.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (PSSA, 5) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION Declaration in support for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Williams.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by Anthony Williams.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.