This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2022 at 07:51:33 (UTC).

Williams v. The Kroger Co. et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Kroger Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Geraghty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02223

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Geraghty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zuri Williams

Defendants

The Kroger Co.

Witron Integrated Logistics Corp.

John Doe Defendants 1 Through 12

Wioss Atlanta, LP

Hood-Clayton Logistics, LLC

Americold Logistics, LLC

Dominique Gatson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Meredith Stein Watts

Natanya Brooks

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew G. Moffett

Jeffrey Mittar Wasick

Gwendolyn Dralle Havlik

Stevan Anthony Miller

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Natanya Brooks on behalf of Zuri Williams (Brooks, Natanya) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#34

(#34) ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint by Witron Integrated Logistics Corp..(Havlik, Gwendolyn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#33

(#33) ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Witron Integrated Logistics Corp..(Havlik, Gwendolyn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/28/2022)

32 #1

Exhibit A

#23

(#28) ANSWER to #23 Second Amended Complaint by Hood-Clayton Logistics, LLC, The Kroger Co..(Wasick, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/25/2022)

19 #3

Summons Wioss Atlanta

19 #2

Summons Hood-Clayton Logistics

19 #1

Summons Americold Logistics

19 #19

Main Document

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 6/9/2022. (sap) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Kroger Co.. (Wasick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Kroger Co.. Discovery ends on 11/4/2022.(Wasick, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Witron Integrated Logistics Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Witron Logistik & Informatik GmbH for Witron Integrated Logistics Corp.. (Havlik, Gwendolyn) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Affidavit

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing

1 #1

Exhibit A - Pleadings

1 #1

Main Document

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Natanya Brooks on behalf of Zuri Williams (Brooks, Natanya) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint by Witron Integrated Logistics Corp..(Havlik, Gwendolyn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Witron Integrated Logistics Corp..(Havlik, Gwendolyn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE by Witron Integrated Logistics Corp. of Intent to Serve Subpoenas on Non-Parties Commanding the Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Havlik, Gwendolyn) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and all other filed documents, as to Americold Logistics LLC. (Brooks, Natanya) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and all other filed documents, as to Hood Clayton Logistics. (Brooks, Natanya) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and all other filed documents, as to Wioss Atlanta LP. (Brooks, Natanya) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ANSWER to #23 Second Amended Complaint by Hood-Clayton Logistics, LLC, The Kroger Co..(Wasick, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Hood-Clayton Logistics, LLC, The Kroger Co..(Wasick, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for service of Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories on Defendant Witron Integrated Logistics Corp. by Zuri Williams.(Watts, Meredith) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for The Kroger Co. by The Kroger Co..(Wasick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Disclosures by Witron Integrated Logistics Corp..(Havlik, Gwendolyn) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: A Telephone Conference is SCHEDULED for 7/11/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Emergency MOTION to Add Parties with Brief In Support by Zuri Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint)(Watts, Meredith) Modified on 7/8/2022 to edit text. (aaq). (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Witron Integrated Logistics Corp..(Havlik, Gwendolyn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 6/9/2022. (sap) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Kroger Co.. (Wasick, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Kroger Co.. Discovery ends on 11/4/2022.(Wasick, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Witron Integrated Logistics Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Witron Logistik & Informatik GmbH for Witron Integrated Logistics Corp.. (Havlik, Gwendolyn) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Witron Integrated Logistics Corp. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11844142) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less