This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 08:50:43 (UTC).

Williams v. State of Mississippi et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Williams filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Mississippi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlton W. Reeves and LaKeysha Greer Isaac. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlton W. Reeves

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Merlin Lkent Williams

Defendants

State of Mississippi

Harrison County Sheriff Dept. A.D.C.

Gulfport Police Dept.

Harrison County Circuit Court

Mississippi Dept. of Corrections

United States National Criminal Information Center

Et Cetera Alia Defendants

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Envelope

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Amend Relief in re #6 Amended Complaint, filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) MOTION to Amend Relief in re #6 Amended Complaint, filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138, filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 3/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 2/9/2023 (ND) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gulfport Police Dept., Harrison County Circuit Court, Harrison County Sheriff Dept. A.D.C., Mississippi Dept. of Corrections, State of Mississippi, Et Cetera Alia Defendants, and United States National Criminal Information Center filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (ND) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2023: #1 Envelope) (ND). (Entered: 01/23/2023)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by Merlin Lkent Williams. NEW ADDRESS: South MS Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 1419, Leakesville, MS 39451. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER: on or before 2/13/2023, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 1/12/2023 (ND) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

2 #1

Envelope

2 #2

Main Document

1 #3

Notice of Assignment

1 #2

Envelope

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Amend Relief in re #6 Amended Complaint, filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Amend Relief in re #6 Amended Complaint, filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138, filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 3/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 2/9/2023 (ND) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gulfport Police Dept., Harrison County Circuit Court, Harrison County Sheriff Dept. A.D.C., Mississippi Dept. of Corrections, State of Mississippi, Et Cetera Alia Defendants, and United States National Criminal Information Center filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (ND) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2023: #1 Envelope) (ND). (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by Merlin Lkent Williams. NEW ADDRESS: South MS Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 1419, Leakesville, MS 39451. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: on or before 2/13/2023, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 1/12/2023 (ND) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to File, filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Et Cetera Alia Defendants, Gulfport Police Dept., Harrison County Circuit Court, Harrison County Sheriff Dept. A.D.C., Mississippi Dept. of Corrections, State of Mississippi, and United States National Criminal Information Center filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Table of Evidence with attached Exhibits, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(ND) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less